Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2815114 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2815114



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
01.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
31.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.08.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
09.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
09.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 13
09.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
09.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.07.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Priority document Search / examination 24
15.12.2014 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
30.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
22.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
28.07.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 16
01.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
08.02.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
08.02.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
08.02.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 10
08.02.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1