Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2815114


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
28.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
03.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
25.08.2017 (Expected) grant published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
16.08.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
15.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.05.2017 Change - representative
08.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - German title published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - English title published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
21.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.11.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.07.2016 First examination report
25.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
10.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
26.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2014 Change - representative
21.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication