Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812864

EP2812864 - PAYMENT SYSTEM, PAYMENT TERMINAL OF SAID SYSTEM, AND ASSOCIATED PAYMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THALES
45, rue de Villiers
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / D'ATHIS, Thierry
THALES Communications&Security S.A. BP 57
F-91229 Bretigny Sur Orge Cedex / FR
02 / LEONETTI, Jean
THALES Communications&Security S.A. BP 57
F-91229 Bretigny Sur Orge Cedex / FR
03 / RATIER, Denis
THALES Communications&Security S.A. BP 57
F-91229 Bretigny Sur Orge Cedex / FR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2016/41]
Former [2014/51]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date13703104.308.02.2013
[2016/41]
WO2013EP52594
Priority number, dateFR2012000038809.02.2012         Original published format: FR 1200388
[2014/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013117726
Date:15.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2812864
Date:17.12.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812864
Date:12.10.2016
Language:FR
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/28, G06Q20/36, G06Q20/34
[2016/11]
Former International [2014/51]G06Q20/28, G06Q20/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHLUNGSSYSTEM, ZAHLUNGSENDGERAT DIESES SYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES ZAHLUNGSVERFAHREN[2016/01]
English:PAYMENT SYSTEM, PAYMENT TERMINAL OF SAID SYSTEM, AND ASSOCIATED PAYMENT METHOD[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE PAIEMENT, TERMINAL DE PAIEMENT DE CE SYSTÈME, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PAIEMENT ASSOCIÉ[2014/51]
Former [2014/51]ZAHLUNGSSYSTEM, ZAHLUNGSTERMINAL DES SYSTEMS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES ZAHLUNGSVERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase08.08.2014National basic fee paid 
08.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
09.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.07.2016Fee for grant paid
01.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
05.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16170839.1  / EP3093813
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2016
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.02.2013
AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MT12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
LU08.02.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MT12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
LU08.02.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
LU08.02.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/42]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV12.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]FR2636153  (PARIENTI RAOUL [FR]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 35 - line 37 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2591008  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * * page 17, line 24 - line 27 * * page 19, line 3 - line 10 *