Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2812864 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2812864



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 377
17.08.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.09.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.09.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.09.2016 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
05.09.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.09.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
05.09.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
24.08.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
13.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.07.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
01.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
01.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2016 Description Search / examination 15
01.07.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
01.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
09.03.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
19.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.10.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
14.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
16.09.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
03.09.2014 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
08.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
08.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.07.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
15.07.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.07.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.07.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.07.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.07.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.05.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
15.05.2014 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
28.03.2014 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.03.2014 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.03.2014 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.01.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.01.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.01.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.01.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.12.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.12.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.12.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
19.12.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
19.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
03.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
15.08.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
08.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
08.02.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
08.02.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
08.02.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 15
08.02.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7