Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2812864


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
22.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
18.08.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
09.09.2016 (Expected) grant published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
05.09.2016 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
05.09.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.07.2016 Change - representative
07.07.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.07.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.05.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  29.06.2016  [2016/26]
08.03.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.02.2016 Change - classification published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - classification published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
30.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2015 Change - German title published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
10.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
31.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
04.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
09.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication