Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2812864 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380009006 CN201510509302 EP13703104 EP16170839



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3093813Global Dossier 16.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
EP13703104 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105117909BGlobal Dossier 02.08.2019B
CN105117909 02.12.2015A
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
CN201380009006 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104169953BGlobal Dossier 15.06.2016B
CN104169953 26.11.2014A
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
WO2013EP52594 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2812864Global Dossier 12.10.2016B1
EP2812864 17.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
WO2013EP52594 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013204734B 14.05.2015B2
AU2013204734 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
WO2013EP52594 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2812864T 09.01.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
WO2013EP52594 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2609011T 18.04.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
WO2013EP52594 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN6563DELNP2014 22.05.2015A
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
WO2013EP52594 08.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013117726Global Dossier 14.11.2013A3
WO2013117726 15.08.2013A2
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2986889 17.10.2014B1
FR2986889 16.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA201501656 29.06.2016B
Priority number Date
FR1200388 09.02.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3093813