Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800633

EP2800633 - DISPENSING HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.07.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / ALBISETTI, Nicolas
28 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau
F-95210 Saint Gratien / FR
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13703137.303.01.2013
WO2013IB50059
Priority number, dateFR2012005004603.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250046
US201261604876P29.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261604876 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102866
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800633
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B05B1/06, B05B1/26, B65D83/28
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:AUSGABEKOPF[2014/46]
English:DISPENSING HEAD[2014/46]
French:TÊTE DE DISTRIBUTION[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US3462085  (NUGARUS ANTHONY R) [X] 1-13,15,17 * the whole document *;
 [XDA]CH596888  (CERBERUS AG) [XD] 1,4,7-13,15,17,18,20-23 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 6 * * figure - * [A] 3,5,6,14;
 [X]WO0207894  (MEZZOLI GIORGIO [IT]) [X] 1,4,5,7-12,20,22 * abstract *;
 [X]US2785926  (BERNARD LATASTE) [X] 1-5,8-11,13,15,16,19 * abstract *;
 [X]US2681254  (FULLER GEORGE W) [X] 1,14 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 12 *;
 [X]US5215260  (ROBBINS TOM E [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP1035038  (OREAL [FR]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0034] *
by applicantEP1052023
 EP1035038
 WO2011065413
 CH596888