Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2800633 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2800633



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 219
05.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.11.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.11.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
05.11.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
05.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
26.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
16.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
16.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.09.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
25.09.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.09.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
02.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
22.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
03.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
30.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
11.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
15.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2