Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800633


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 (Expected) grant published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
11.11.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.01.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.09.2018 First examination report
19.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
06.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication