Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2800633 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380011873 EP13703137



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9700902Global Dossier 11.07.2017B2
US2015041559 12.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314370424 03.01.2013
US201261604876 29.02.2012
WO2013IB50059 03.01.2013
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104144751BGlobal Dossier 04.05.2018B
CN104144751 12.11.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013IB50059 03.01.2013
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2800633Global Dossier 12.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261604876 29.02.2012
WO2013IB50059 03.01.2013
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014016490 04.07.2017A8
BR112014016490 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2013IB50059 03.01.2013
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR2985202 05.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX352980 15.12.2017B
MX2014008137 21.08.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261604876 29.02.2012
WO2013IB50059 03.01.2013
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2610769 15.02.2017C2
RU2014126620 20.02.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013IB50059 03.01.2013
FR1250046 03.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013102866Global Dossier 11.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261604876 29.02.2012
FR1250046 03.01.2012