Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813113

EP2813113 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK POWER CONTROL IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2018/35]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SORRENTINO, Stefano
Hannebergsgatan 32
SE-171 68 Solna / SE
02 / ANTÓ, Aram
Professorslingan 39
SE-114 17 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[2018/35]
Former [2014/51]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date13703163.921.01.2013
[2018/35]
WO2013SE50036
Priority number, dateUS201261596338P08.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261596338 P
US201261616806P28.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261616806 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119166
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813113
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813113
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/54, H04W52/32
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UPLINK-LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2014/51]
English:A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK POWER CONTROL IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE EN LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.06.2018Fee for grant paid
18.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.07.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
20.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2015
Opposition(s)31.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
LU21.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2011078631  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; CHUNG JAE HOON [KR]; KIM DONG CHEOL [KR]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-14,16-20,22-24 * the whole document *;
 [P]US2012208583  (CHUNG JAE HOON [KR] ET AL) [P] * paragraphs [0047] , [0054] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0123] *;
 [Y]  - SAMSUNG, "SRS Transmission Power Control", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-120183 SRS TPC COMP, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120131), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050562749 [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-14,16-20,22-24 * the whole document *