Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805422

EP2805422 - HIGH EFFICIENCY TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ASURI, Bhushan Shanti
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / CHAMAS, Ibrahim Ramez
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / GUDEM, Prasad Srinivasa Siva
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13703202.518.01.2013
[2017/14]
WO2013US22208
Priority number, dateUS20121335306218.01.2012         Original published format: US201213353062
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109933
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805422
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805422
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/04
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHEFFIZIENTER SENDER[2014/48]
English:HIGH EFFICIENCY TRANSMITTER[2014/48]
French:EMÉTTEUR DE HAUTE EFFICACITÉ[2016/46]
Former [2014/48]ÉMETTEUR À RENDEMENT ÉLEVÉ
Entry into regional phase18.08.2014National basic fee paid 
18.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2017Fee for grant paid
23.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.11.2015
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/25]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1931053  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,10-15,19,20 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] * * figure 2A *;
 [IY]WO2007056137  (MAGNOLIA BROADBAND INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8-20 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 3 * * figure 2 * * page 10, line 12 - line 14 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 11 * [Y] 5-7;
 [Y]US7570932  (FOLKMANN ANDREW F [US]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US7444124  (LOEB WAYNE [US], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract *