Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2805422


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
09.02.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
03.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
01.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.10.2016 Change - French title published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
03.06.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.03.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.11.2015 First examination report
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
04.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
18.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication