Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807291

EP2807291 - METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.11.2015  [2015/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicor Materials Inc.
530 Lytton Ave., 2nd Floor
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Dan
103 Whitwell Drive
Brampton, Ontario L6P 1E3 / CA
02 / DASTGIRI, Damon
1 Antrim Crescent no. 503
Scarborough, Ontario M1P 4P2 / CA
03 / KIRSCHT, Fritz G.
Wernitzer Strasse 36
12621 Berlin / DE
04 / TUMMILLO, Anthony
7-105 Heath St. W.
Toronto, Ontario M4V 1T5 / CA
05 / ZHANG, Chunhui
5854 Dalebrook Cres.
Missauga, Ontario L5M 5R8 / CA
06 / OUNADJELA, Kamel
116 Clipper Drive
Belmont, California 94002 / US
07 / TURENNE, Alain
141 Stirling Ave. North
Kitchener, Ontario N2H 3G9 / CA
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)LifeTech IP Spies Danner & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Elsenheimerstrasse 47a
80687 München / DE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13703250.425.01.2013
WO2013US23215
Priority number, dateUS201261591073P26.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591073 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013112884
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2807291
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C30B29/06, B24C1/00, B24C1/08, C30B33/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON SILICIUM[2014/49]
English:METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF SILICON[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DU SILICIUM EN CASCADE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
08.10.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011044877  (TURENNE ALAIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,14 * paragraphs [0051] - [0071] - [0073] - [0074] - [ 103]; example 1; claims 1,16 *;
 [A]WO02072312  (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1-11; claim 1 * * page 3, lines 11-16 *
by applicantUS20100729561
 US20100760222
 US20100716889
 US20100947936