Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810417

EP2810417 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING PREAMBLE SYMBOLS IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marvell World Trade Ltd.
L'Horizon
Gunsite Road
Brittons Hill
St. Michael 14027 / BB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Marvell World Trade Ltd.
L'Horizon Gunsite Road 14027 Brittons Hill
Saint Michael / BB
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Hongyuan
4707 Paseo Padre Pkwy Fremont
CA 94555 / US
02 / SRINIVASA, Sudhir
358 Calado Avenue Cambell
CA 95008 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13703292.630.01.2013
WO2013US23741
Priority number, dateUS201261592432P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261592432 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116268
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810417
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PRÄAMBELSYMBOLEN IN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN[2014/50]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING PREAMBLE SYMBOLS IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS[2014/50]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GÉNÉRER DES SYMBOLES DE PRÉAMBULE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2014National basic fee paid 
29.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010129239  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0044] , [0059] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 1,5,7,8,11-13 * [I] 2-10,12-20;
 [I]US2011096796  (ZHANG HONGYUAN [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] , [0060] , [0098] , [0140] , [0147]; figures 2-21 *;
 [I]US2011051705  (JONES IV VINCENT KNOWLES [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0057] - [0065]; figures 4,6,7,9,10 *