Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815139

EP2815139 - RADIAL BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / RUDOLPH, Ralph
Josef-Hofmiller-Weg 5
87549 Kranzegg / DE
02 / FUCHS, Andreas
Vilstalstrasse 35
87459 Pfronten-Ried / DE
03 / SPÖRL, Klaus-Peter
Überlinger Str. 11
87439 Kempten / DE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13703347.829.01.2013
[2016/16]
WO2013EP51607
Priority number, dateDE2012100271314.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012002713
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120687
Date:22.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815139
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815139
Date:20.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16C17/03
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RADIALLAGER[2014/52]
English:RADIAL BEARING[2014/52]
French:PALIER RADIAL[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2014National basic fee paid 
12.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
26.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2016Fee for grant paid
02.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
24.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2015
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU29.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2019/31]HU29.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/52]ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP1369605  (MAIN METALL GIESSEREI FRITZ SC [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,11-13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0031] - [0033] - [0036] - [0039]; figures 2,3A,3C * [Y] 8-10,16,17 [I] 2,3;
 [X]US2011019950  (HIRAI TAKAMASA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4-6,12 * paragraphs [0056] - [0063] - [0066] , [0072]; figures 2,5,9 *;
 [X]JP2009257349  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0034] , [0037] , [0040] - [0045]; figures 3,4,5; claim 2 *;
 [XI]JPS58102819  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,5,6,14 * abstract * [I] 15;
 [Y]JPS58180815  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 8-11,16 * figures 3-5 *;
 [Y]US4247157  (SIGG HANS) [Y] 9-11,16,17 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 34; figures 1,2 *