Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809346

EP2809346 - ADENOVIRAL VECTOR-BASED MALARIA VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2017  [2017/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GenVec, Inc.
910 Clopper Road, Suite 220N
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / BRUDER, Joseph T.
567 Chestertown Street
Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US
02 / GALL, Jason G., D.
31 Bronco Court
Germantown, Maryland 20874 / US
03 / MCVEY, Duncan
6016 Muncaster Mill Road
Derwood, Maryland 20855 / US
04 / BROUGH, Douglas E.
9121 Tulip Grove Road
Gaithersburg, Maryland 20879 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13703506.901.02.2013
WO2013US24262
Priority number, dateUS201261593953P02.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261593953 P
US201261593964P02.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261593964 P
US201261593980P02.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261593980 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116591
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809346
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/015, C12N7/00, C12N15/861
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:AUF ADENOVIRALEN VEKTOREN BASIERENDER MALARIA-IMPFSTOFF[2014/50]
English:ADENOVIRAL VECTOR-BASED MALARIA VACCINE[2014/50]
French:VACCIN CONTRE LA MALARIA À BASE D'UN VECTEUR ADÉNOVIRAL[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2014National basic fee paid 
27.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
10.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/30]
22.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010051367  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]; ROY SOUMITRA [US]; WILSON JAMES M [US]; VANDEN) [X] 1,3,5,11,14,18,51,55,59,65,279-285,290-294 * page 2, line 13 - line 25 * * page 45, line 28 * * page 32, paragraph 3 * [Y] 286-289 [I] 2,4,6-10,12,13,15-17,19-50,52-54,56-58,60-64,66-88;
 [A]WO2010138675  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]; ROY SOUMITRA [US]; WILSON JAMES M [US]; VANDEN) [A] 1 * page 36, line 23 - line 27 * * page 40, line 6 *;
 [X]  - Roy S et al, "Simian adenovirus 43 nucleotide sequence SEQ ID NO:23.", EMBL, E.B.I. Hinxton U.K., (20100708), Database accession no. AYA37235, XP002694690 [X] 1,3,5,11,14,18,51,55,59,65,279-285,290-294 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - LIMBACH K J ET AL, "Viral vectors in malaria vaccine development", PARASITE IMMUNOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 31, no. 9, doi:10.1111/J.1365-3024.2009.01141.X, ISSN 0141-9838, (20090901), pages 501 - 519, (20090626), XP002601705 [Y] 286-289 * page 507, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 509, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 513, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 514, column 2, paragraph 2 * * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-3024.2009.01141.X
 [A]  - WEVERS DIANA ET AL, "A novel adenovirus of Western lowland gorillas (Gorilla gorilla gorilla)", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20101105), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-422X-7-303, ISSN 1743-422X, page 303, XP021080233 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-422X-7-303
 [A]  - REYES-SANDOVAL ARTURO ET AL, "Single-dose immunogenicity and protective efficacy of simian adenoviral vectors against Plasmodium berghei", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, (20080301), vol. 38, no. 3, doi:10.1002/EJI.200737672, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 732 - 741, XP009103956 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200737672
by applicantUS5998205
 US5837511
 US5851806
 US5994106
 US6127175
 US6482616
 US7195896
 WO9428152
 WO9502697
 WO9516772
 WO9534671
 WO9622378
 WO9712986
 WO9721826
 WO03022311
 WO0000628
 WO9700326
 US5994128
 US6033908
 US2008233650
 US6677156
 US6682929
 WO03020879
 US5464758
 US5814618
 US7112715
 US6500641
 US6472176
 WO0248377
 US6225289
 US6514943
 WO0034444
 WO2011057254
    - GRAVES; GELBAND, COCHRANE DATABASE SYST. REV., (2003), vol. 1, page CD000129
    - MOORE ET AL., LANCET INFECT. DIS., (2002), vol. 2, pages 737 - 743
    - CARVALHO ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 56, pages 327 - 343
    - MOORTHY; HILL, BR. MED. BULL., (2002), vol. 62, pages 59 - 72
    - GREENWOOD; ALONSO, CHEM. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 80, pages 366 - 395
    - RICHIE; SAUL, NATURE, (2002), vol. 415, pages 694 - 701
    - SEDEGAH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 9866 - 9870
    - DOOLAN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, pages 1739 - 1746
    - WANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 476 - 4,80
    - ROGERS ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, pages 5565 - 5572
    - ROGERS ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN, (2002), vol. 70, pages 4329 - 4335
    - WANG ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1998), vol. 66, pages 4193 - 41202
    - LE ET AL., VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 1893 - 1901
    - EPSTEIN ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (2002), vol. 13, pages 1551 - 1560
    - SEDEGAH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 7648 - 7653
    - ZAVALA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 280, pages 155 - 159
    - PARDOLL, NAT. REV. IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 2, pages 227 - 238
    - GINSBERG ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1966), vol. 28, pages 782 - 83
    - ROBERTS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 232, pages 1148 - 51
    - STEWART ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 67, pages 145 - 54
    - STEWART ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 2589 - 99
    - CURIEL ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 154
    - BOULANGER ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1979), vol. 44, pages 783 - 800
    - "Adenoviridae and their replication", HORWITZ M.S. ET AL., Virology, 2nd ed.,, RAVEN PRESS, LTD., (1990), pages 1679 - 1721
    - GHOSH-CHOUDHURY ET AL., EMBO J, (1987), vol. 6, pages 1733 - 1739
    - VAN OOSTRUM ET AL., J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 56, pages 439 - 448
    - LUTZ ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 5102 - 5109
    - FIELD ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, pages 9487 - 9495
    - GALL ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 10260 - 264
    - RUX ET AL., J. VIROL., (2003), vol. 77, no. 17, pages 9553 - 9566
    - JOMVALL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1981), vol. 256, no. 12, pages 6181 - 6186
    - CRAWFORD-MIKSZA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 1836 - 1844
    - DEVAUX ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 567 - 88
    - YEH ET AL., VIRUS RES., (1991), vol. 33, pages 179 - 98
    - HENRY ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, no. 8, pages 5239 - 46
    - NOVELLI ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 185, pages 365 - 76
    - GREEN ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, pages 1357 - 65
    - CHROBOCZEK ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 186, pages 280 - 85
    - SIGNAS ET AL., J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 53, pages 672 - 78
    - NEUMANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 153 - 157
    - BAI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 5198 - 5205
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOLECULAR BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, no. 3, pages 403 - 410
    - BEIGERT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2009), vol. 106, no. 10, pages 3770 - 3775
    - SODING, BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 951 - 960
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 3389 - 3402
    - MORSY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 965 - 976
    - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 1645 - 1650
    - KOCHANEK ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (1999), vol. 10, pages 2451 - 2459
    - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN. WROL., (1977), vol. 36, pages 59 - 72
    - BROUGH ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 9206 - 9213
    - GARDNER ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 419, pages 498 - 511
    - CARLTON ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 419, pages 512 - 9
    - JONGWUTIWES ET AL., AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1994), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 659 - 668
    - DAME ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 225, pages 593 - 599
    - DEL PORTILLO ET AL., MOL. BIOCHEM., PARASITOL., (1987), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 289 - 294
    - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185
    - NO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 3346 - 3351
    - INDRA ET AL., NUC. ACID. RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 4324 - 4327
    - NUC. ACID. RES., (2000), vol. 28, page E99
    - KRAMER; FUSSENEGGER, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 308, pages 123 - 144
    - LADUNGA ET AL., CURRENT OPINIONS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 11, pages 13 - 18
    - BLAU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA., (1999), vol. 96, no. 3, pages 797 - 799
    - LIMBACH ET AL., MALARIA JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 10, page 65