Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804470

EP2804470 - ANDROECIOUS CUCURBIT PLANTS, METHODS OF OBTAINING AND USES OF SAID CUCURBIT PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA)
147, rue de l'Université
75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
Vilmorin et Cie
4 quai de la Mégisserie
75001 Paris / FR
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BENDAHMANE, Abdelhafid
51 avenue Charles de Gaulle
F-91830 Le Coudray Montceaux / FR
02 / TROADEC, Christelle
59 rue Gabriel Péri
F-94200 Ivry-sur-Seine / FR
03 / BOUALEM, Adnane
41 rue Louise De Keroual
91000 Evry / FR
04 / HOSEMANS, Danièle
12 rue du Margat
F-49100 Angers / FR
05 / FAUVE, Julie
15 Grand Rue
F-30000 Nimes / FR
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 Place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date13703521.816.01.2013
WO2013EP00106
Priority number, dateFR2012000014916.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1200149
[2014/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107632
Date:25.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804470
Date:26.11.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01H1/04, A01H5/08, C12N15/82
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:ANDRODIÖZISCHE KÜRBISPFLANZEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER GEWINNUNG UND VERWENDUNG DIESER KÜRBISPFLANZEN[2014/48]
English:ANDROECIOUS CUCURBIT PLANTS, METHODS OF OBTAINING AND USES OF SAID CUCURBIT PLANTS[2014/48]
French:CUCURBITACEES ANDROIQUES, PROCEDES D'OBTENTION ET UTILISATIONS DE CES CUCURBITACEES[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
12.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2018
09.11.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2934277  (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2900415  (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2007125264
 WO2010012948
 WO9504064
    - BOUALEM ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, pages 836 - 838
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, AD. APP. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - EDGAR; ROBERT C., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, page 1792
    - MC CALLUM ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 123, pages 439 - 442
    - KOORNBEEF ET AL., MUTAT.RES., (1982), vol. 93, pages 109 - 123
    - MC CALLUM ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 123, pages 439 - 442
    - MICHELMORE, R.W. ET AL., "Identification of markers linked to disease-resistance genes by bulked segregant analysis: A rapid method to detect markers in specific genomic regions by using segregating populations", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1991), vol. 88, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.88.21.9828, pages 9828 - 9832, XP002184162

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.21.9828
    - VOS, P. ET AL., "AFLP: a new technique for DNA fingerprinting", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 21, no. 21, pages 4407 - 4414