blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2804470 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2804470



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1468
15.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
15.05.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 58
15.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
15.05.2019 Description Search / examination 56
15.05.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
07.05.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 58
07.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
07.05.2019 Description Search / examination 56
07.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.05.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.03.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
08.03.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.11.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.11.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
31.10.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.10.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.10.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
29.10.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 57
29.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
29.10.2018 Description Search / examination 56
29.10.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.10.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 57
24.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
24.10.2018 Description Search / examination 56
24.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
19.10.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
19.10.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
06.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
06.09.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
03.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
03.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
03.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
03.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
03.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.09.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
11.04.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.03.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.03.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
30.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 60
30.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
30.11.2017 Description Search / examination 59
30.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
27.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 60
27.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
27.11.2017 Description Search / examination 59
27.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.11.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
13.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
13.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
13.03.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
07.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
07.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.03.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.11.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
27.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
27.05.2016 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Non-scannable object Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
17.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
17.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
17.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
17.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
17.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
17.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
17.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
21.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
21.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
12.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
12.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
12.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
12.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
11.12.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
21.11.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
22.08.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
18.07.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 55
18.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
08.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
02.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 101
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 66
19.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
06.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
18.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
18.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 7
18.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 53
18.01.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3
18.01.2013 Sequence listing PCT receiving Office 51