blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2804470


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.10.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
23.03.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
26.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.11.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.03.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.05.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.03.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2015 First examination report
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
25.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
06.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication