Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811851

EP2811851 - TOBACCO SMOKE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2019  [2019/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Essentra Filter Products Development Co. Pte. Ltd
238A Thomson Road
25-04/05 Novena Square
Singapore 307684 / SG
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LISAN, Ahmad Fashihul
PT Filtrona Indonesia
JI. Berbek Industri I 18-20
Surabaya Industrial Estate Rungkut (SIER)
Rungkut (SIER)
Sidoarjo 61256 / ID
02 / WIDIARTO, Sudirman
PT Filtrona Indonesia
JI. Berbek Industri I 18-20
Surabaya Industrial Estate Rungkut (SIER)
Rungkut (SIER)
Sidoarjo 61256 / ID
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/14]
Former [2014/51]Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date13703571.307.02.2013
[2019/14]
WO2013EP52385
Priority number, dateGB2012000222008.02.2012         Original published format: GB 201202220
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117620
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811851
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811851
Date:03.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A24D3/02
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FILTER FÜR TABAKRAUCH[2014/51]
English:TOBACCO SMOKE FILTER[2014/51]
French:FILTRE À FUMÉE DE TABAC[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
19.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2019Fee for grant paid
13.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2011148130  (FILTRONA INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-20 * page 2, line 1 - page 8, line 2; figure 4 * [Y] 21-24;
 [XYI]US4291711  (BERGER RICHARD M) [X] 1-8,12-20 * column 5, line 19 - column 8, line 36; figure - * [Y] 21-24 [I] 9-11;
 [Y]WO2010108739  (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [Y] 21-24 * page 11, line 19 - page 21, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]WO2011058319  (FILTRONA INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 14; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO03082558  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4281671
 US4228246