Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800682

EP2800682 - CONTROL DEVICE OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.12.2016  [2016/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Koji
c/o TOYOTA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENT
CORPORATION
1-21, IMAE, Hamamoto-cho
Toyota, Aichi, 470-0334 / JP
02 / OKUDA, Takayoshi
c/o TOYOTA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENT
CORPORATION
1-21, IMAE, Hamamoto-cho
Toyota, Aichi, 470-0334 / JP
03 / YAGUCHI, Hideaki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
04 / HASHIMOTO, Toshiya
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13703639.803.01.2013
WO2013IB00002
Priority number, dateJP2012000076605.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012000766
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013102840
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2800682
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60W30/18, B60W20/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2014/46]
English:CONTROL DEVICE OF VEHICLE[2014/46]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
11.11.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2206622  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-11 * figure 4 * [Y] 7;
 [XA]GB2413999  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]; SKODA AUTO AS [CZ]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-9;
 [Y]US2010006358  (ISHIKAWA NAOKI [JP]) [Y] 7 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP2223835  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009326790  (CHRISTEN URS [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2007203835