Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813061

EP2813061 - CONTROLLING MOBILE DEVICE BASED ON SOUND IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2019  [2019/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Taesu
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / HWANG, Kyu Woong
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / JIN, Minho
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Richardson, Julie Kate , et al
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Richardson, Julie Kate , et al
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date13703690.129.01.2013
WO2013US23607
Priority number, dateUS201261596576P08.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261596576 P
US20131375208028.01.2013         Original published format: US201313752080
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119418
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813061
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/27
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:STEUERN EINES MOBILEN GERÄTES ANHAND VON TONIDENTIFIKATION[2018/11]
English:CONTROLLING MOBILE DEVICE BASED ON SOUND IDENTIFICATION[2014/51]
French:CONTRÔLE DES PROCÉDÉS D'UN TERMINAL MOBILE SUR LA BASE D'IDENTIFICATION DE SON[2018/11]
Former [2014/51]STEUERUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG AUF DER BASIS VON KLANGIDENTIFIZIERUNG
Former [2014/51]COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF MOBILE BASÉE SUR UNE IDENTIFICATION SONORE
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/01]
28.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1176503  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16,18,23,26-40,50-54 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0239] * * figures 1-31 * [I] 17,19-25,41-49;
 [XI]US2006129637  (YOSHIDA ICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-16,18,23,26-40,50-54 * abstract * * figures 3a,3b,4 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 17,19-25,41-49;
 [A]WO2011088053  (APPLE INC [US]; GRUBER THOMAS ROBERT [US]; CHEYER ADAM JOHN [US]; KITT) [A] 1-54 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - Dean A. Rutter, "SIRI A Primer", (20111231), URL: http://venturewerks.com/Siri-A-Primer.pdf, (20130503), XP055061828 [X] 17,19-25,41-49 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 1 * [I] 1-16,18,23,26-40,50-54