Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809671

EP2809671 - IMIDAZO [4, 5 - B]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS ALK AND JAK MODULATORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cephalon, Inc.
41 Moores Road P.O. Box 4011
Frazer, PA 19355 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / BRESLIN, Henry J.
1974 Muhlenburg Drive
Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
02 / CURRY, Matthew A.
336 Baltusrol Drive
Coatesville, Pennsylvania 19320 / US
03 / GINGRICH, Diane E.
23 Southwind Lane
Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US
04 / LEARN, Keith S.
3039 Gottschall Road
Perkiomenville, Pennsylvania 18074 / US
05 / OTT, Gregory R.
117 Wilton Woods Lane
Media, Pennsylvania 19063 / US
06 / WAGNER, Jason C.
720 Baron Crest Way
Coatesville, Pennsylvania 19320 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13703698.430.01.2013
[2016/02]
WO2013US23778
Priority number, dateUS201261592074P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261592074 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116291
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809671
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809671
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, C07D491/107, A61K31/437, A61K31/5377, A61K31/496, A61K31/4545, A61K31/444, A61K31/506, A61P35/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBA01.09.2014
ME01.09.2014
TitleGerman:IMIDAZO[4,5-B]-PYRIDINDERIVATE ALS ALK- UND JAK-MODULATOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG PROLIFERATIVER ERKRANKUNGEN[2014/50]
English:IMIDAZO [4, 5 - B]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS ALK AND JAK MODULATORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS[2014/50]
French:DÉRIVÉS IMIDAZO [4,5-B]PYRIDINE COMME MODULATEURS D'ALK ET DE JAK POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES PROLIFÉRATIFS[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
30.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2015Fee for grant paid
10.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2015
Opposition(s)14.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2013
AL13.01.2016
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU30.01.2013
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU30.01.2013
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU30.01.2013
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
MT13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MT13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
IE30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/35]FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/24]BE31.01.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007077949  (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]; INOUE TAKAYUKI [JP]; TANAKA AKIRA [JP]; NAKA) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007007919  (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]; INOUE TAKAYUKI [JP]; TOJO TAKASHI [JP]; MORI) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009001021  (CHROMA THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]; BAVETSIAS VASSILIOS [GB]; MCDONALD EDWAR) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004016611  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]; JOHANSSON HENRIK [SE]; LAWITZ KAROLINA [SE]; NIKI) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004099204  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]; HEMMERLING MARTIN [SE]; KLINGSTEDT TOMAS [SE]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
by applicant   - IWAHARA, T. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 439 - 449
    - MORRIS, S.W. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, no. 18, pages 2175 - 2188
    - BILSLAND, J.G. ET AL., NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2008), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 685 - 700
    - SILVENNOINEN, O. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, no. 18, pages 8429 - 33
    - WITTHUHN, B. A. ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 227 - 36
    - NICHOLSON, S. E. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1994), vol. 91, no. 8, pages 2985 - 8
    - ARGETSINGER, L. S. ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 237 - 44
    - BENEKLI, M., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, no. 8, pages 2940 - 54
    - PEETERS, P. ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, no. 7, pages 2535 - 40
    - REITER, A. ET AL., CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 65, no. 7, pages 2662 - 7
    - TAKEMOTO, S. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 25, pages 13897 - 902
    - WALZ, C. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, no. 26, pages 18177 - 83
    - BAXTER, E. J. ET AL., LANCET, (2005), vol. 365, no. 9464, pages 1054 - 61
    - JAMES, C. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, no. 7037, pages 1144 - 8
    - LEVINE, R. L. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2005), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 387 - 97
    - SHANNON, K.; R. A. VAN ETTEN, CANCER CELL, (2005), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 291 - 3
    - GRIESINGER, F. ET AL., GENES CHROMOSOMES CANCER, (2005), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 329 - 33
    - LACRONIQUE, V. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, no. 5341, pages 1309 - 12
    - "Prodrugs as Novel Delivery Systems", T. HIGUCHI; W. STELLA, ACS Symposium Series, vol. 14
    - ARMITAGE, J.O. ET AL., Cancer: Principle and Practice of Oncology, (2001), pages 2256 - 2316
    - KUTOK J.L.; ASTER J.C., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 3691 - 3702
    - FALINI, B. ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 94, pages 3509 - 3515
    - MORRIS, S.W. ET AL., BRIT. J. HAEMATOL., (2001), vol. 113, pages 275 - 295
    - KUEFER, MU ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, pages 2901 - 2910
    - BAI, R.Y. ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 6951 - 6961
    - BAI, R.Y. ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, pages 4319 - 4327
    - ERGIN, M. ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (2001), vol. 29, pages 1082 - 1090
    - SLUPIANEK, A. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 2194 - 2199
    - TURTURRO, F. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 8, pages 240 - 245
    - LAWRENCE, B. ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2000), vol. 157, pages 377 - 384
    - PALMER, R.H. ET AL., BIOCHEM. J, (2009), vol. 420, no. 3, pages 345 - 361
    - CHIARLE, R. ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER, (2008), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 11 - 23
    - MANO, H., CANCER SCI, (2008), vol. 99, no. 12, pages 2349 - 2355
    - STOICA, G. ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 16772 - 16779
    - POWERS, C. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 14153 - 14158
    - MENTLEIN, R. ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2002), vol. 83, pages 747 - 753
    - WEBB, T.R. ET AL., EXPERT REV. ANTI-CANCER THER., (2009), vol. 9, pages 331 - 356
    - PALMER, R.H. ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2009), vol. 420, pages 345 - 361
    - CHIARLE, R. ET AL., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2008), vol. 8, pages 11 - 23
    - MANO H., CANCER SCI., (2008), vol. 99, pages 2349 - 2355
    - SODA, M. ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 448, pages 561 - 566
    - CHOI Y.L ET AL., CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, pages 4971 - 4976
    - TAKEUCHI, K. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 15, pages 3143 - 3149
    - PIVA, R. ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 689 - 697
    - GALLON, A.V. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, pages 270 - 275
    - CHRISTENSEN, J.G. ET AL., MOL. CANCER. THER., (2007), vol. 6, pages 3389 - 3395
    - SODA, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 19893 - 19897
    - KOIVUNEN, J.P ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, pages 4275 - 4283
    - MOSSE, Y.P. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 930 - 936
    - CHEN, Y. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 971 - 974
    - GEORGE, R.E. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 975 - 978
    - JANOUEIX-LEROSEY, I. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 967 - 970
    - MCDERMOTT, U ET AL., CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, pages 3389 - 3395
    - PASSONI, L. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 69, pages 7338 - 7346
    - MCDERMOTT, U. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, pages 3389 - 3395
    - HANAHAN, D.; WEINBERG, R.A., CELL, (2000), vol. 100, pages 57 - 70
    - SHAH, N.P.; SAWYERS, C.L., ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 7389 - 7395
    - ENGELMAN, J.A; SETTLEMAN, J., CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEVELOP., (2008), vol. 18, pages 1 - 7
    - LIU, J. ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2008), vol. 22, pages 791 - 799
    - DESAI, J. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 5398 - 5405
    - ENGELMAN, J.A.; JANNE, P.A., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, pages 2895 - 2899
    - ANGELES, T. S. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 236, pages 49 - 55
    - ROTIN, D. ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 559 - 567
    - KAIK, M.; GAWRONSKI, J., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2003), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1559 - 1563