Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809671


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
17.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
18.11.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
11.12.2015 (Expected) grant published on  13.01.2016  [2016/02]
13.11.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.11.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.11.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.06.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
30.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
03.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
02.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication