Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2809671
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9238656Global Dossier 19.01.2016B2
US2014350011 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414446411 30.07.2014
US201261592074 30.01.2012
WO2013US23778 30.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2809671Global Dossier 13.01.2016B1
EP2809671 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261592074 30.01.2012
WO2013US23778 30.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2567552T 25.04.2016T3
Priority number Date
US201261592074 30.01.2012
WO2013US23778 30.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1204610 27.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261592074 30.01.2012
WO2013US23778 30.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013116291Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261592074 30.01.2012