Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811957

EP2811957 - APPARATUSES FOR FOLDING ABSORBENT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/51]APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR FOLDING ABSORBENT ARTICLES
[2017/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LENSER, Todd, Douglas
5765 White Path Lane
Liberty Township, Ohio 45011 / US
02 / WHALEY, Mark, David
6981 Larkspur Lane
Liberty Township, Ohio 45044 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13703701.630.01.2013
[2017/43]
WO2013US23831
Priority number, dateUS20121336837808.02.2012         Original published format: US201213368378
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119436
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811957
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811957
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/49, A61F13/15
[2017/24]
Former International [2014/51]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM FALTEN EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKELS[2017/24]
English:APPARATUSES FOR FOLDING ABSORBENT ARTICLES[2017/24]
French:APPAREILS DE PLIAGE D'ARTICLES ABSORBANTS[2017/24]
Former [2014/51]VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM FALTEN EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKELS
Former [2014/51]APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR FOLDING ABSORBENT ARTICLES
Former [2014/51]APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS DE PLIAGE D'ARTICLES ABSORBANTS
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2017Fee for grant paid
14.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2016
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/49]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/47]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1607357  (ZUIKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0023] - [0055]; figure - *;
 [X]EP2380540  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0016] - [0109]; figure - *;
 [X]WO2010101284  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]; YAMAMOTO HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 18 - page 14, line 26; figure - *;
 [X]WO2011118751  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]; YAMAMOTO HIROKI [JP]; TAKEUCHI KENJI [JP]; KAWAZU) [X] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantUS5628097
 US5916661
 US6545197
 US6107539
 US4610678
 US4673402
 US4888231
 US4834735
 US5599335
 US5562646
 US5669894
 US6790798
 US2004158212
 US2004097895
 US3860003
 US4909803
 US4695278
 US4795454
 US4704115
 US7569039
 US2005107764
 US7587966
 US6248195
 US6546987
 US7383865
 US20090434984
 US20100795021