Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807008

EP2807008 - METHOD OF FABRICATION OF A PROPELLER BLADE IN COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROPELLER BLADE FROM A COMPOSITE MATERIAL
[2015/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snecma
2 Bld du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
SAFRAN
2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MATHON, Richard
Snecma PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
02 / FOUSSARD, Olivier
60 rue de la cognette
91450 Etiolles / FR
03 / MARCHAL, Yann
Snecma PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
04 / VARIN, Franck, Bernard, Léon
Snecma PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
 [2016/15]
Former [2014/49]01 / MATHON, Richard
Snecma PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
02 / FOUSSARD, Olivier
60 rue de la cognette
F-91450 Etiolles / FR
03 / MARCHAL, Yann
Snecma PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
04 / VARIN, Franck, Bernard, Léon
Snecma PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13704196.824.01.2013
[2016/15]
WO2013FR50145
Priority number, dateFR2012005071025.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250710
FR2012005070525.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250705
FR2012005070725.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250707
FR2012005070825.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250708
[2014/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110895
Date:01.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807008
Date:03.12.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807008
Date:13.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29B11/16, B29C33/00, B29D99/00, B29C70/54, B29C70/48, B29C70/08, B29C70/86, B29C31/08, B64C11/26, B29L31/08, // B23P15/04, B64F5/00, B64D27/00, B29C70/24
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/49]B29B11/16, B29C33/00, B29D99/00, B29C70/54, B29C70/48, B29C70/08, B29C70/86, B29C31/08, B64C11/26, B29L31/08, B64C27/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG EINES PROPELLERBLATTES AUS VERBUNDKUNSTSTOFF[2015/45]
English:METHOD OF FABRICATION OF A PROPELLER BLADE IN COMPOSITE MATERIAL[2015/45]
French:METHODE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PALE D'HELICE EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE[2015/45]
Former [2014/49]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PROPELLERBLATTS AUS VERBUNDMATERIAL
Former [2014/49]METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROPELLER BLADE FROM A COMPOSITE MATERIAL
Former [2014/49]MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PALE D'HÉLICE EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
25.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2016Fee for grant paid
22.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2015
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.01.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU24.01.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2019/31]HU24.01.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/43]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/47]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2012001279  (SNECMA [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 12 * * page 17, lines 1-9 *;
 [A]EP1777063  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0029] , [0045] - [0050]; figures 1,2,4,5; claims 1,6 *;
 [A]FR2683764  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [AD]FR2940173  (SNECMA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 13 * * page 1, lines 1-5,23-26 * * page 2, lines 13-29 * * page 3, lines 11-33 * * page 4, lines 16-34 * * page 6, lines 10-16 *;
 [A]EP2308670  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] - [0090] , [0093]; figures 1,3; claim 1 *
by applicantWO2012001279
 FR2683764
 FR2940173