Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803144

EP2803144 - WIRELESS DOCKING LINK BUDGET OPTIMIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DRAAIJER, Maurice Herman Johan
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / VAN DE LAAR, Franciscus Antonius Maria
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / HOLTMAN, Koen Johanna Guillaume
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Coops, Peter
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Coops, Peter
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13704228.904.01.2013
WO2013IB50079
Priority number, dateUS201261586357P13.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261586357 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105005
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803144
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B5/00, H04B7/08, G06F1/16, G06F1/26
[2019/08]
Former International [2014/47]H04B5/00, H04B7/08, G06F1/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINES BUDGETS FÜR DRAHTLOSE ANDOCKVERKNÜPFUNGEN[2014/47]
English:WIRELESS DOCKING LINK BUDGET OPTIMIZATION SYSTEM[2014/47]
French:SYSTÈME D'OPTIMISATION DE BUDGET DE LIAISON D'ACCUEIL SANS FIL[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
18.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010057969  (MEIRI DROR [IL], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0032] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO9723063  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 14 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 7 * * figure 2 *