Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809437

EP2809437 - IMPROVED METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF STABLE CERIUM OXIDE ORGANIC COLLOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cerion LLC
One Blossom Road
Rochester, NY 14610 / US
[2015/19]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Cerion Enterprises LLC
One Blossom Road
Rochester, NY 14610 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PROK, Gary, Robert
15 Birchstone Hill Road
Rush, NY 14543 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Stephen, Charles
639 Linden Street
Rochester, NY 14620 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P.
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13704313.930.01.2013
[2018/13]
WO2013US23790
Priority number, dateUS201261632778P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261632778 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013116300
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809437
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809437
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STABILEN ORGANISCHEN KOLLOIDEN AUS CEROXID[2017/51]
English:IMPROVED METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF STABLE CERIUM OXIDE ORGANIC COLLOIDS[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERFECTIONNÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE COLLOÏDES ORGANIQUES D'OXYDE DE CÉRIUM STABLES[2014/50]
Former [2014/50]VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ORGANISCHEN KOLLOIDEN AUS STABILEM CER
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
11.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2018Fee for grant paid
15.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201503   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/12]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/45]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/40]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[AD]US6271269  (CHANE-CHING JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [AD] 1-15 * column 2, lines 61-65 * * column 3, lines 33-61 * * column 7, line 43 - column 9, line 31 * * examples 6,7 *;
 [XDA]US2010152077  (ALLSTON THOMAS D [US], et al) [XD] 15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0027] , [0039] - [0041] - [0046] , [0050] , [0054] - [0056] - [0060] * [A] 1-14;
 [A]US6210451  (CHOPIN THIERRY [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 3 - line 27 * * column 6, lines 42-49 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 67 * * column 9, lines 23-26 *
by applicantUS2010242342
 US2010152077
 US7459484
 US2006005465
 US6271269