Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802607

EP2802607 - DUAL ANTIGEN-INDUCED BIPARTITE FUNCTIONAL COMPLEMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Julius-Maximilians-Universität Würzburg
Sanderring 2
97070 Würzburg / DE
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / STUHLER, Gernot
Hasenbühlsteige 1/2
72070 Tübingen / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/40]
Former [2014/47]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13704369.114.01.2013
[2017/40]
WO2013EP50603
Priority number, dateEP2012015112513.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12151125
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013104804
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2802607
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802607
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/46, A61K39/00, G01N33/574
[2016/43]
Former International [2014/47]C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DUALE ANTIGEN-INDUZIERTE ZWEITEILIGE FUNKTIONALE KOMPLEMENTIERUNG[2016/43]
English:DUAL ANTIGEN-INDUCED BIPARTITE FUNCTIONAL COMPLEMENTATION[2014/47]
French:COMPLÉMENTATION FONCTIONNELLE BIPARTITE INDUITE PAR DOUBLE ANTIGÈNE[2014/47]
Former [2014/47]DUALE ANTIGENINDUZIERTE ZWEITEILIGE FUNKTIONALE KOMPLEMENTIERUNG
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.03.2017Fee for grant paid
08.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17193746.9  / EP3333190
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.01.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.07.2018   
Revitope Limited
Fiveways
57-59 Hatfield Road
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  04.07.2018   
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/32]
Opponent(s)01  03.07.2018   
Revitope Limited
Fiveways
57-59 Hatfield Road
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  04.07.2018   
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
24.07.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/37]EE04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
Former [2018/27]LV04.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007062466  (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]; CHRISTOPHERSON RICHARD IAN [AU]; MATTHEWS JACQUELINE) [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2004042404  (UNIV ERASMUS [NL]; VAN DONGEN JACOBUS JOHANNES MA [NL]; STAAL FRANK JA) [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010022225  (IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US]; GOLDENBERG DAVID) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9315210  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1561759  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]; OZAKI SHUJI [JP]; ABE MASAHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP2133093  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - BIOLINK PARTNERS LTD, "Demibodies: Dimerization-activated therapeutic antibodies", INTERNET CITATION, (2007), URL: http://www.biolink.org.au/library/File/Demibodies.pdf, (20070101), XP003013805 [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *
 [YP]  - SEIFERT OLIVER ET AL, "The IgM CH2 domain as covalently linked homodimerization module for the generation of fusion proteins with dual specificity.", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN & SELECTION : PEDS OCT 2012, (201210), vol. 25, no. 10, ISSN 1741-0134, pages 603 - 612, XP002699346 [YP] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/gzs059
 [Y]  - KAWASHIMA REI ET AL, "EpCAM- and EGFR-targeted selective gene therapy for biliary cancers using Z33-fiber-modified adenovirus.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER. JOURNAL INTERNATIONAL DU CANCER 1 SEP 2011, (20110901), vol. 129, no. 5, ISSN 1097-0215, pages 1244 - 1253, XP002699347 [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.25758
 [Y]  - VAN BEUSECHEM VICTOR W ET AL, "Efficient and selective gene transfer into primary human brain tumors by using single-chain antibody-targeted adenoviral vectors with native tropism abolished.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY MAR 2002, (200203), vol. 76, no. 6, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 2753 - 2762, XP002699348 [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.76.6.2753-2762.2002
 [Y]  - OHIRO YOSHIYUKI ET AL, "A homogeneous and noncompetitive immunoassay based on the enhanced fluorescence resonance energy transfer by leucine zipper interaction", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 74, no. 22, doi:10.1021/AC0203387, ISSN 0003-2700, (20021115), pages 5786 - 5792, (20021019), XP002605915 [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AC0203387
 [A]  - XIE Z ET AL, "A new format of bispecific antibody: highly efficient heterodimerization, expression and tumor cell lysis", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050101), vol. 296, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JIM.2004.11.005, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 95 - 101, XP004738464 [A] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2004.11.005
 [A]  - KIPRIYANOV S M ET AL, "Generation and production of engineered antibodies", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, INC, US, (20040101), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1385/MB:26:1:39, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 39 - 60, XP009044299 [A] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:26:1:39
 [A]  - ZHAO ET AL, "Therapeutic applications of superantibodies", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20050915), vol. 10, no. 18, doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(05)03530-0, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 1231 - 1236, XP005103828 [A] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(05)03530-0
 [A]  - HEUSER C ET AL, "An anti-MUC1-antibody-interleukin-2 fusion protein that activates resting NK cells to lysis of MUC1-positive tumour cells", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, HARCOURT PUBLISHERS, (20030101), vol. 89, no. 6, doi:10.1038/SJ.BJC.6601267, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 1130 - 1139, XP003013806 [A] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjc.6601267
 [A]  - MILLER KATHY ET AL, "Design, construction, and in vitro analyses of multivalent antibodies.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 MAY 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12728922, (20030501), vol. 170, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4854 - 4861, XP002675910 [A] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.170.9.4854
 [A]  - RHEINNECKER M ET AL, "Multivalent antibody fragments with high functional affinity for a tumor-associated carbohydrate antigen.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 OCT 1996 LNKD- PUBMED:8816407, (19961001), vol. 157, no. 7, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2989 - 2997, XP002675911 [A] 1-46 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - KIMURA N ET AL, "2D7 diabody bound to the alpha2 domain of HLA class I efficiently induces caspase-independent cell death against malignant and activated lymphoid cells", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20041224), vol. 325, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2004.10.163, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1201 - 1209, XP004649732 [Y] 1-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.10.163
by applicantWO2007062466
 WO2004016782
 EP1536005
    - MULLER; KONTERMANN, "Bispecific antibodies for cancer immunotherapy: Current perspectives", BIODRUGS, (2010), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:doi:10.2165/11530960-000000000-00000, pages 89 - 98, XP009164507

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/11530960-000000000-00000
    - BARGOU, R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, pages 974 - 977
    - REICHERT, DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (2012), vol. 17, pages 954 - 963
    - UEDA, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1714 - 1718
    - ZHU, PROTEIN SCI., (1997), vol. 6, pages 781 - 8
    - PLUCKTHUN, IMMUNOTECH., (1997), vol. 3, pages 83 - 105
    - WORN, JMB, (2001), vol. 305, pages 989 - 1010
    - Protein'Protein Interactions: Methods and Applications, HUMANA PRESS, (20040323), vol. 261, page 1
    - DOUGLAS MAGDE, PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1972), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 705 - 708
    - BARGOU R ET AL., "Tumor regression in cancer patients by very low doses of a T cell-engaging antibody", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, no. 5891, doi:doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1158545, pages 974 - 7, XP002615656

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1158545
    - TOPP MS ET AL., "Targeted therapy with the T-cell-engaging antibody blinatumomab of chemotherapy-refractory minimal residual disease in B-lineage acute lymphoblastic leukemia patients results in high response rate and prolonged leukemia-free survival", J CLIN ONCOL., (2011), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1200/JCO.2010.32.7270, pages 2493 - 8, XP055112754

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2010.32.7270
    - NAGAI T ET AL., "A variant of yellow fluorescent protein with fast and efficient maturation for cell-biological applications", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200201), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0102-87, pages 87 - 90, XP002218913

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0102-87
    - KAIN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1995), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 650 - 55
    - COLMAN, NATURE, (1987), vol. 326, pages 358 - 363
    - AMIT, SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 747 - 753
    - LAW, INT IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 389 - 400
    - UEDA, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1714 - 1718
    - OSSENKOPPELE ET AL., "Review of the relevance of aberrant antigen expression by flow cytometry in myeloid neoplasms", BR J HAEMATOL, (2011), vol. 153, no. 4, pages 421 - 36
    - NATASHA Y. FRANK; TOBIAS SCHATTON; MARKUS H. FRANK, "The therapeutic promise of the cancer stem cell concept", J CLIN INVEST., (2010), vol. 120, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI41004, pages 41 - 50, XP055212054

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI41004
    - VASSILOPOULOS A ET AL., "Identification and characterization of cancer initiating cells from BRCA1 related mammary tumours using markers for normal mammary stem cells", INT J BIOL SCI, (2008), vol. 4, pages 133 - 142
    - "The Cancer Genome Anatomy Project: building a new information and technology platform for cancer research", STRAUSBERG RL., Molecular Pathology of Early Cancer, IOS PRESS, (1999), pages 365 - 370
    - ZHOU J; BELOV L; HUANG PY; SHIN JS; SOLOMON MJ; CHAPUIS PH; BOKEY L; CHAN C; CLARKE C; CLARKE SJ, "Surface antigen profiling of colorectal cancer using antibody microarrays with fluorescence multiplexing", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2010), vol. 355, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jim.2010.01.015, pages 40 - 51, XP055054063

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2010.01.015
    - CARTER P; SMITH L; RYAN M., "Identification and validation of cell surface antigens for antibody targeting in oncology", ENDOCR RELAT CANCER, (2004), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1677/erc.1.00766, pages 659 - 87, XP009078100

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/erc.1.00766
    - BARRETT T ET AL., "NCBI GEO: archive for functional genomics data sets-10 years on", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2011), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkq1184, pages D1005 - 10, XP055067018

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkq1184
    - YOGANAND BALAGURUNATHAN, "Gene expression profiling-based identification of cell-surface targets for developing multimeric ligands in pancreatic cancer", MOL CANCER THER, (2008), vol. 7, pages 3071 - 3080
    - BLUEMEL C; HAUSMANN S; FLUHR P; SRISKANDARAJAH M; STALLCUP WB; BAEUERLE PA; KUFER P., "Epitope distance to the target cell membrane and antigen size determine the potency of T cell-mediated lysis by BiTE antibodies specific for a large melanoma surface antigen", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (201008), vol. 59, no. 8, pages 1197 - 209, XP019842190
    - ORLANDI R; GUSSOW PT, "Cloning immunoglobulin variable domains for expression by the polymerase chain reaction", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.10.3833, pages 3833 - 3837, XP000026475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.10.3833
    - WANG Z; RAIFU M; HOWARD M; SMITH L; HANSEN D; GOLDSBY R; RATNER D, "Universal PCR amplification of mouse immunoglobulin gene variable regions: the design of degenerate primers and an assessment of the effect of DNA polymerase 3' to 5'exonuclease activity", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2000), vol. 233, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(99)00184-2, pages 167 - 177, XP004188255

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(99)00184-2
    - ESSONO S; FROBERT Y; GRASSI J; CREMINO C; BOQUET D, "A general method allowing the design of oligonucleotide primers to amplify the variable regions from immunoglobulin cDNA", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2003), vol. 279, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(03)00242-4, pages 251 - 266, XP004455324

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(03)00242-4
    - GOLDENBERG DM; CHATAL JF; BARBET J; BOERMAN 0; SHARKEY RM., "Cancer Imaging and Therapy with Bispecific Antibody Pretargeting", UPDATE CANCER THER., (200703), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.uct.2007.04.003, pages 19 - 31, XP022153216

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.uct.2007.04.003
    - PEZARD C; BERCHE P; MOCK M., "Contribution of individual toxin components to virulence of Bacillus anthracis", INFECT. IMMUN., (1991), vol. 59, no. 10, page 3472, XP000650053
    - KREITMAN RJ, AAPS J., (20060818), vol. 8, no. 3, pages E532 - 51
    - PASTAN I; HASSAN R; FITZGERALD DJ; KREITMAN RJ, "Immunotoxin treatment of cancer", ANNU. REV. MED., (2007), vol. 58, pages 221 - 37, XP009134786
    - "Gaussia princeps luciferase", CHOPRA A., Molecular Imaging and Contrast Agent Database (MICAD, NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE
    - SANTOS EB ET AL., "Sensitive in vivo imaging of T cells using a membrane-bound Gaussia princeps luciferase", NAT MED., (20090215), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 338 - 44
    - INOUE Y ET AL., "Gaussia luciferase for bioluminescence tumor monitoring in comparison with firefly luciferase", MOL IMAGING, (20110426), vol. 10, pages 377 - 85
    - KERPPOLA TK., "Visualization of molecular interactions using bimolecular fluorescence complementation analysis: characteristics of protein fragment complementation", CHEM SOC REV., (2009), vol. 38, pages 2876 - 86
    - REMY I; MICHNICK S, "A highly sensitive protein-protein interaction assay based on Gaussia luciferase", NATURE METHODS, (2006), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth979, pages 977 - 979, XP009102125

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth979
    - VAN DAM GM ET AL., "Intraoperative tumor-specific fluorescence imaging in ovarian cancer by folate receptor-a targeting: first in-human results", NAT MED., (20110918), vol. 17, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nm.2472, pages 1315 - 9, XP055299051

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2472
    - MACK, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1995), vol. 92, pages 7021 - 7025
    - MAETZEL, NAT CELL BIOL, (2009), vol. 11, pages 162 - 171
    - MUNZ, CANCER CELL INT, (2010), vol. 10, page 44
    - LINKE, R ET AL., "Catumaxomab: clinical development and future directions", MABS, (2010), vol. 2, pages 129 - 136
OppositionWO2007062466
 WO9409131
 US8076459
 EP1536005
    - MASUDA et al., "Loss or down-regulation of HLA class I expression at the allelic level in freshly isolated leukemic blasts", Cancer Sci., (20070000), vol. 98, no. 1, pages 102 - 108, XP055509323

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2006.00356.x
    - AGNES BANASZEK et al., "Abstract of a Short Communication presented at the 8 Fabisch-Symposium", Cancer Research and Molecular Cell Biology, (20120321), XP055512109
    - AGNES BANASZEK, "Dual Antigen-Restricted Complementation of a Two-Part Trispecific Antibody for Targeted lmmunotherapy of Blood Cancer", Dissertation, (20130900), XP055512112
    - HOCHMAN et al., "An Active Antibody Fragment (Fv) Composed of the Variable Portions of Heavy and Light Chains", Biochemistry, (19730000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 1130 - 1135, XP055512115
    - HOCHMAN et al., "Folding and Interaction of Subunits at the Antibody Combining Site", Biochemistry, (19760000), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 2706 - 2710, XP055512118

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00657a034
    - ANTHONY et al., "PRODUCTION OF STABLE ANTI-DIGOXIN FV IN ESCHERICHIA-COLI", Molecular Immunology, (19920000), vol. 29, pages 1237 - 1247, XP002433796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(92)90060-B
    - Polymenis M. et al., "Domain Interactions and Antigen Binding of Recombinant Anti-Z-DNA Antibody Variable Domains", Journal of Immunology, (19950000), vol. 154, no. 5, pages 2198 - 2208, XP055512121
    - UEDA et al., "OPEN SANDWICH ELISA: A NOVEL IMMUNOASSAY BASED ON THE INTERCHAIN INTERACTION OF ANTIBODY VARIABLE REGION", Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 1714 - 1718, XP002085341

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1296-1714
    - HORNE et al., "NONCOVALENT ASSOCIATION OF HEAVY AND LIGHT CHAINS OF HUMAN IMMUNOGLOBULINS", Journal of Immunology, (19820801), vol. 129, no. 2, pages 660 - 664, XP055512125
    - WARD et al., "BINDING ACTIVITIES OF A REOPERTOIRE OF SINGLE IMMUNOGLOBULIN VARIABLE DOMAINS SECRETED FROM ESCHERICHIA COLI", Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, no. 6242, pages 544 - 546, XP000086104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/341544a0
    - WANG et al., "A New Recombinant Single Chain Trispecific Antibody Recruits T Lymphocytes to Kill CEA (Carcinoma Embryonic Antigen) Positive Tumor Cells In Vitro Efficiently", J. Biochem., (20040000), vol. 135, no. 4, pages 555 - 565, XP055132180

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jb/mvh065
    - JORDAN et al., "Evaluation of the potential use of hybrid LC-MS/MS for active drug quantification applying the 'free analyte QC concept'", Bioanalysis., (20170000), vol. 9, no. 21, pages 1705 - 1717, XP055512175

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4155/bio-2017-0158