Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2806855 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2806855



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1017
10.10.2019 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
27.09.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 58
23.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 167
23.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 154
23.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 3
23.09.2019 Claims Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
23.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.09.2019 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 35
15.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.05.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.05.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 3
29.04.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
23.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Change of representative of the proprietor Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.04.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.04.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
10.04.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
23.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.02.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
05.02.2018 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 3
05.02.2018 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 3
24.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
24.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
22.01.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
11.01.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 23
03.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
03.01.2018 Description Search / examination 23
03.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.01.2018 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
01.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
16.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 23
16.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Description Search / examination 23
16.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.03.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 24
09.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
09.12.2016 Description Search / examination 24
09.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
29.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Annex Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
01.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
02.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
01.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
01.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
10.03.2015 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 10
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
17.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
01.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
17.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
23.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
23.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
23.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 23
23.01.2013 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 28