Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2806855


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.09.2019 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
08.05.2019 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
29.04.2019 Change - representative
28.04.2019 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
12.04.2019 Opposition filed published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
06.07.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
08.06.2018 (Expected) grant published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
30.05.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
31.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
23.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.01.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.08.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.07.2017 Change - French title published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
18.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.06.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.03.2016 First examination report
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.12.2015 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.01.2016  [2016/04]
16.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
30.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication