Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2806855 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380006645 CN201610080909 EP13704372 EP15202117 EP18181331 EP19167775 EP19167829 EP19167835 EP19167839



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018296573Global Dossier 18.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
US201514417484 26.01.2015
US201816015666 22.06.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10028964Global Dossier 24.07.2018B2
US2015164915 18.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101895279BGlobal Dossier 05.09.2018B1
KR20170116234 18.10.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101786586BGlobal Dossier 18.10.2017B1
KR20150089093 04.08.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101560288BGlobal Dossier 14.10.2015B1
KR20140114374 26.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6104282BGlobal Dossier 29.03.2017B2
JP2015508416 19.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3527199Global Dossier 21.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
EP18181331 23.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3527198Global Dossier 21.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
EP18181331 23.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3527197Global Dossier 21.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
EP18181331 23.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3527196Global Dossier 21.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
EP18181331 23.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3412277Global Dossier 12.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3020394Global Dossier 18.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
EP15202117 23.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105726548BGlobal Dossier 14.05.2019B
CN105726548 06.07.2016A
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
CN201380006645 23.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104080444BGlobal Dossier 20.06.2017B
CN104080444 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2806855Global Dossier 11.07.2018B1
EP2806855 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013211656B 13.07.2017B2
AU2013211656 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014017481 04.07.2017A8
BR112014017481 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2862548 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2806855T 03.09.2018T3
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA026267 31.03.2017B1
EA201491281 30.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2683254T 25.09.2018T3
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1200021 31.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20181550T 30.11.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL233784D 30.09.2014D0
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LT2806855T 10.10.2018T
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA35859 01.12.2014B1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX355729 27.04.2018B
MX2014008631 21.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ627837 29.04.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PH12014501565 08.10.2014B1
PH12014501565 08.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2806855T 31.12.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS57637 30.11.2018B1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201404350P 28.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2806855T 30.11.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP13704372 23.01.2013
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TN2014000322 21.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA115543 27.11.2017C2
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201405464 23.12.2015B
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51187 23.01.2013
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013110632Global Dossier 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8778402Global Dossier 15.07.2014B2
US2013189324 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR089805 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2014001966 14.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO7010836 31.07.2014A2
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EA031566 31.01.2019B1
EA201690187 31.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GEP201706767 10.11.2017B
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE040525T 28.03.2019T2
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY165888 18.05.2018A
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE17032014 24.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2806855T 28.09.2018T
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI559940B 01.12.2016B
TW201334810 01.09.2013A
Priority number Date
EP12152392 25.01.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3020394
 EP3412277
 EP3527196
 EP3527197
 EP3527198
 EP3527199