Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2806855

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SMLapse: 11.07.2018
 TR 
Examination procedure24.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted11.07.2018
Opposition procedure23.09.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140717
 
Event date:06.04.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160302
 
Event date:27.09.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170901
 
Event date:14.02.2018 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED)
 
Event date:21.02.2018 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20180124
 
Event date:11.07.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:11.07.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:11.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:13.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1016171 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20180715
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:WAGNER + HELBIG PATENTANWAELTE CONSEILS EN PRO, CH
 
Event date:02.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602013040053 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:08.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:29.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:03.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20180827
 
Event date:25.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2683254 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180925
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2806855 PT 20180928 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20180807
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:22.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20180711
 
Event date:30.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:15.11.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E016008 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20181002
 
Event date:08.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 28548 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:08.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20180402650 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20190125
 
Event date:28.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E040525 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:29.03.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20190128
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602013040053 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20190128
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20190129
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20190110
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20190129
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20190102
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20190201
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190128
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20190107
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190123
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190125
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20190126
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190129
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20190104
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20190104
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20190102
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20190118
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20190104
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20190204
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:15.05.2019 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ZBM PATENTS, S.L.
Effective DATE:20190410
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Payment DATE:20190116
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20190103
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20190130
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190129
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20190103
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20180711
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20190104
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20181228
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Payment DATE:20190108
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20181231
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20190129
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20190123
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20190128
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20190115
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20190108
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20190102
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20190104
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20190128
Year of Fee Payment:07