Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806855

EP2806855 - DRY POWDER FORMULATION COMPRISING A CORTICOSTEROID AND A BETA-ADRENERGIC FOR ADMINISTRATION BY INHALATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2019New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo, 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MONARI, Elisa
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
02 / CANTARELLI, Anna Maria
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
03 / COCCONI, Daniela
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
04 / PASQUALI, Irene
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Dempster, Robert Charles
Script IP Limited
Turnpike House
18 Bridge Street
Frome
Somerset BA11 1BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13704372.523.01.2013
[2018/28]
WO2013EP51187
Priority number, dateEP2012015239225.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12152392
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110632
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806855
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806855
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/14, A61K31/167, A61K31/57, A61P11/00, A61P11/06
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBA17.07.2014
ME17.07.2014
TitleGerman:TROCKENPULVERFORMULIERUNG MIT EINEM CORTICOSTEROID UND EINEM BETA-ADRENERGIKUM ZUR VERABREICHUNG MITTELS INHALATION[2014/49]
English:DRY POWDER FORMULATION COMPRISING A CORTICOSTEROID AND A BETA-ADRENERGIC FOR ADMINISTRATION BY INHALATION[2014/49]
French:FORMULATION DE POUDRE SÈCHE COMPRENANT UN CORTICOSTÉROÏDE ET UN BÉTA-ADRÉNERGIQUE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION PAR INHALATION[2017/35]
Former [2014/49]FORMULATION DE POUDRE SÈCHE COMPORTANT UN CORTICOSTÉROÏDE ET UN BÊTA-ADRÉNERGIQUE POUR ADMINISTRATION PAR INHALATION
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
01.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.01.2018Fee for grant paid
03.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2018Observations by third parties
24.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15202117.6  / EP3020394
EP18181331.2  / EP3412277
EP19167775.6  / EP3527196
EP19167829.1  / EP3527197
EP19167835.8  / EP3527198
EP19167839.0  / EP3527199
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.04.2019   
ZBM PATENTS, S.L.
Pl. Catalunya 1, 2nd Floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Rambla Catalunya, 123
08008 Barcelona / ES
 [N/P]
Former [2019/20]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2019   
ZBM PATENTS, S.L.
Pl. Catalunya 1, 2nd Floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
15.05.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.09.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM11.07.2018
[2019/26]
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2011131663  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XD]WO0178693  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 3 * * page 10, line 27 - page 12, line 19 * * page 14, line 18 - page 16, line 10 * * page 16 - page 21; example 1 * * page 32 - page 33; example 11 * * claims 1-14 *;
 [X]EP1982709  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, paragraphs 13,14 * * column 3, paragraph 23 - column 4, paragraph 27 * * column 5, paragraphs 34-38 * * column 7; example 3 *;
 [X]EP1944018  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1312357  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 21 - page 4, paragraph 25 * * page 4 - page 6; example 1 * * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]WO2011120779  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 8 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 26 * * page 14, lines 5-17 * * page 16, lines 15,16,27 * * page 19, line 25 - page 21, line 15 * * page 22 - page 31; examples 1,6 *;
 [A]WO0228377  (ORION CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, lines 10-23 * * page 4, lines 20-30 * * page 9, lines 2-14 * * page 10, lines 23-34 * * page 11 - page 16; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]US6645466  (KELLER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011018532  (BREATH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GUCHARDI R ET AL, "Influence of fine lactose and magnesium stearate on low dose dry powder inhaler formulations", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20071219), vol. 348, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2007.06.041, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 10 - 17, XP022393884 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2007.06.041
by applicantWO0178693
 WO2011131663
 WO0178695
 WO2004012801
 EP1760008
    - European Pharmacopeia
    - COLOMBO I ET AL., IL FARMACO, (1984), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 328 - 341
    - CHEW ET AL., J PHARM PHARMACEUT SCI, (2002), vol. 5, pages 162 - 168
    - European Pharmacopeia, (2008), pages 293 - 295
OppositionWO0178693
 US2010055192
    - Bel E. et al., "Abstracts 21st Annual Congress", European Respiratory Journal, (20110900), vol. 38, no. 55, pages 139 - 140, XP055582843
    - Zuccaro F. , Et Al., "Therapeutic equivalence of beclomethasone dipropionate/formoterol administered via NEXT DPI with beclomethasone/formoterol administered via HFA pMDI in adult asthmatic patients", Annual Congress Barcelona, (20100000), URL: https://www.ers-education.org/events/international-congress/barcelona-20 10.aspx?idParent=80635, XP055582859
    - L. M. FABBRI et al., "Inhaled beclometasone dipropionate/formoterol extra-fine fixed combination in the treatment of asthma: evidence and future perspectives", Expert Opin. Pharmacothery, (20080000), vol. 9, pages 479 - 490, XP055582866

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14656566.9.3.479
    - C. LEACH et al., "Particle size of inhaled corticosteroids: Does it matter?", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20090000), vol. 124, pages 88 - 93, XP055582867

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2009.09.050
    - N. BARNES et al., "Asthma control with extra fine-particle hydrofluoralkane- beclometasone vs. large-particle chlorofluorocarbon. beclometasone: a real-world observational study", Clinical et Experimental Allergy, (20110000), vol. 41, pages 1521 - 1532, XP055582871