Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804647

EP2804647 - NEBULIZER DEVICE FOR MEDICAL AEROSOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LA DIFFUSION TECHNIQUE FRANCAISE
18 Rue de la Presse
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / VECELLIO-NONE, Laurent
6 Rue des Tamaris
31170 Chambray Les Tours / FR
02 / CHANTREL, Gilles
33 rue Horace Vernet
42100 Saint-Etienne / FR
03 / MASSARDIER, Michel
5 Place Maréchal Foch
Résidence Primevères
42000 Saint-Etienne / FR
 [2016/52]
Former [2014/48]01 / VECELLIO-NONE, Laurent
6 Rue des Tamaris
F-31170 Chambray Les Tours / FR
02 / CHANTREL, Gilles
33 rue Horace Vernet
F-42100 Saint-Etienne / FR
03 / MASSARDIER, Michel
5 Place Maréchal Foch
Résidence Primevères
F-42000 Saint-Etienne / FR
Representative(s)Cabinet Laurent & Charras
3 place de l'Hotel de Ville
CS 70203
42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR
[2016/52]
Former [2014/48]Cabinet Laurent & Charras
3 Place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203
42005 Saint Etienne Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date13704622.318.01.2013
[2016/52]
WO2013FR50114
Priority number, dateFR2012005056920.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250569
[2014/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107992
Date:25.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804647
Date:26.11.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804647
Date:28.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M11/00, A61M15/00, B05B17/06
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERNEBLERVORRICHTUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE AEROSOLE[2014/48]
English:NEBULIZER DEVICE FOR MEDICAL AEROSOLS[2014/48]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NEBULISATION POUR AEROSOLS MEDICAUX[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
02.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2016Fee for grant paid
17.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2016
Opposition(s)29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.01.2013
AT28.12.2016
CY28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE18.01.2017
LU18.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU18.01.2013
AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE18.01.2017
LU18.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE18.01.2017
LU18.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE18.01.2017
LU18.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/51]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
LU18.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005056274  (KUNSCHIR EDUARD [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE20115203U  (PARI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * page 2, lines 4-20 *;
 [AD]WO0134232  (PARI GMBH [DE]; PRE HOLDING INC [US]; KNOCH MARTIN [DE]; KELLER MANFRE) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10102846  (PARI GMBH [DE] PARI PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005006374  (PARI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009013501  (RESPIRONICS RESPIRATORY DRUG D [GB]; DENYER JONATHAN S H [GB]; PRINCE) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2010008424  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; FINK JOHN B [US]; KADRICHU NANI [US]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP1743671  (DIFFUSION TECH FRANCAISE SARL [FR]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1674122  (DIFFUSION TECH FRANCAISE SARL [FR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9947196  (INHALE THERAPEUTIC SYST [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP2457609
 EP1927373
by applicantWO0134232
 WO2010008424
 EP1743671