Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805574

EP2805574 - LIGHTING DRIVER HAVING MULTIPLE DIMMING INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Osram Sylvania Inc.
100 Endicott Street
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / SIESSEGGER, Bernhard
9 Hardy Street
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
 [2018/24]
Former [2014/48]01 / SIESSEGGER, Bernhard
9 Hardy Street
Danvers, Massachusetts 01923 / US
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2018/24]
Former [2014/48]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date13704652.021.01.2013
[2018/24]
WO2013US22362
Priority number, dateUS201261588838P20.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261588838 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110024
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805574
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805574
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/40, G01R31/44, G01R31/02, G01R31/26, H05B33/08, H01L25/16, H01L25/075, H01L27/15, H01L33/62, H02M7/06
[2018/02]
Former International [2014/48]H05B33/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LED TREIBERSCHALTUNG MIT MEHRFACHEN DIMMSCHNITTSTELLEN[2018/02]
English:LIGHTING DRIVER HAVING MULTIPLE DIMMING INTERFACES[2014/48]
French:CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE ̈À DEL AVEC PLUSIEURS INTERFACE DE GRADATION[2018/02]
Former [2014/48]BELEUCHTUNGSTREIBER MIT MEHREREN DÄMPFUNGSSCHNITTSTELLEN
Former [2014/48]ALIMENTATION D'ÉCLAIRAGE PRÉSENTANT PLUSIEURS INTERFACES DE GRADATION
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
03.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2018Fee for grant paid
02.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2017
Opposition(s)14.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
DK13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
MC13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SI13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
LU21.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
DK13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
MC13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SI13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/26]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
DK13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SI13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
NO13.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2012009622  (LUMENPULSE LIGHTING INC [CA]; CAMPBELL GREGORY [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9,11-17 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2009184662  (GIVEN TERRY [NZ] ET AL) [X] 1,2,12-17 * figure 9 *;
 [X]US2011140611  (ELEK JOSEPH G [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,12-17 * figures 1,2 *