Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807052

EP2807052 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A ONE-PIECE SEAT BACK STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adient Luxembourg Holding S.à r.l.
35F, Avenue John F. Kennedy
1855 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/14]
Former [2017/34]For all designated states
Johnson Controls Technology Company
5757 North Green Bay Avenue
Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Johnson Controls Technology Company
915 East 32nd Street
Holland, MI 49423 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KISH, Joseph M.
50360 Hancock St
Canton, MI 48188 / US
 [2017/29]
Former [2014/49]01 / KISH, Joseph M.
50360 Hancock St
Canton, Michigan 48188 / US
Representative(s)Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date13704660.325.01.2013
[2017/29]
WO2013US23059
Priority number, dateUS201261591071P26.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591071 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112787
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807052
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807052
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2807052
Date:30.08.2017
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/68
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER EINSTÜCKIGEN RÜCKENLEHNENSTRUKTUR[2017/09]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A ONE-PIECE SEAT BACK STRUCTURE[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE MONOBLOC D'UN DOSSIER DE SIÈGE[2017/09]
Former [2014/49]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER EINTEILIGEN SITZLEHNENSTRUKTUR
Former [2014/49]PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE DOSSIER D'UNE SEULE PIÈCE
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
06.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2017Fee for grant paid
12.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.02.2017
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
GB25.01.2018
IE25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
GB25.01.2018
IE25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
GB25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
GB25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU25.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2011127289  (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]; SEIBOLD KURT A [US]; HICKS ROBERT J [US) [X] 10-20 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008]; figures 23-27 * [A] 1-9;
 [A]WO2011103501  (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]; ZEKAVICA ORNELA [US]; WILSON PHILLIP W) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2011US25531