Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811985

EP2811985 - RAPIDLY DISINTEGRATING COATED TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
[2016/23]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
McNEIL-PPC, Inc.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALDMAN, Joel H.
124 Statesman Road
Chalfont, Pennsylvania 18914 / US
02 / FRANZOI, Fernanda
Praca Chui n 33 apto 105
Vila Ema
12200 São José dos Campos - Sao Paulo / BR
03 / BEAN, Anthony S.
785 Hideaway Lane
Harleysville, Pennsylvania 19438 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13704694.201.02.2013
[2018/42]
WO2013US24384
Priority number, dateUS201261595767P07.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595767 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119466
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811985
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811985
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/28, A61K9/20, A61K31/167
[2018/21]
Former International [2014/51]A61K9/28, A61K31/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHNELL ZERFALLENDE FILMTABLETTEN[2014/51]
English:RAPIDLY DISINTEGRATING COATED TABLETS[2014/51]
French:DÉSINTÉGRATION RAPIDE DE COMPRIMÉS ENROBÉS[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2014National basic fee paid 
08.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2018Fee for grant paid
30.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2016
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
MC17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/45]
Former [2019/40]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL17.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006047695  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * figures 1-25; examples 1-6; claims 1-38 *;
 [X]US2004146559  (SOWDEN HARRY S [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * figures 1-11; example 1; claims 1-60 *;
 [X]WO2005070417  (IVAX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 2; examples 1-4; claims 1-38 *;
 [X]  - LIST PH AND HÖRHAMMER L (ED), "Hagers Handbuch der pharmazeutischen Praxis passage", HAGERS HANDBUCH DER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN PRAXIS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19710101), pages 690 - 694, XP002396425 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4906478
 US5275822
 US6103260
 US4279926
 US4873231
 US5424075
 US5510385
 US5234099
 US4683256
 US4543370
 US4643894
 US4828841
 US4725441
 US4802924
 US5630871
 US6274162
    - LEIBERMAN ET AL., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms - Tablets, MARCEL DEKKER INC., (1990), vol. 2, pages 213 - 217,327-