Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2811985 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2811985



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 261
21.08.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.08.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.08.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.05.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
24.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
15.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 23
15.03.2017 Description Search / examination 11
15.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.04.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 8
20.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
10.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2