Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2811985 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380008496 EP13704694



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8900632Global Dossier 02.12.2014B2
US2013202700 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
US201313757206 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104114160Global Dossier 22.10.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2811985Global Dossier 17.10.2018B1
EP2811985 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013217564B 06.04.2017B2
AU2013217564 21.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2862915 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1203162 23.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1204968 11.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX359529 01.10.2018B
MX2014009497 04.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2609836 06.02.2017C2
RU2014136342 27.03.2016A
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012
WO2013US24384 01.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013119466Global Dossier 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261595767 07.02.2012