EP2828717 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AND MONITORING THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLIR UNMANNED AERIAL SYSTEMS AS Nye Vakås vei 56 1395 Hvalstad / NO | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Prox Dynamics AS Smedsvingen 4 1395 Hvalstad / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULSEN, Dag Henning Butterudveien 10 N-1339 Vøyenenga / NO | 02 /
MUREN, Petter Nesveien 9 1394 Nesbru / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | 01 /
PAULSEN, Dag Henning Butterudveien 10 N-1339 Vøyenenga / NO | ||
02 /
MUREN, Petter Nesveien 9 N-1394 Nesbru / NO | |||
Former [2015/05] | 01 /
PAULSEN, Dag Henning Butterudveien 10 N-1339 Vøyenenga / NO | ||
02 /
MUREN, Petter Nesveien 9 N-1341 Slependen / NO | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2015/05] | Application number, filing date | 13704727.0 | 25.01.2013 | WO2013EP51485 | Priority number, date | NO20120000341 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: NO 20120341 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013139509 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828717 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G05D1/0038 (EP,US);
B64C19/00 (US);
G05D1/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG DER UMGEBUNGSBEREICHE EINES UNBEMANNTEN LUFTFAHRZEUGS | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AND MONITORING THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE | [2015/05] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET DE SURVEILLANCE DES ZONES ENVIRONNANTES D'UN VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 07.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY] - GLORIA L CALHOUN* A ET AL, Synthetic vision system for improving unmanned aerial vehicle operator situation awareness, ENHANCED AND SYNTHETIC VISION, SPIE, PAGE(S) 219 - 230, (20050531), ISBN 0-8194-5787-6, XP009168010 [I] 1,8,9 * abstract * * page 220 - page 222 * * page 227 * [Y] 2,3,5 | [Y] - CHAPPELL S L, "UAV control with pictures and pointing", AIAA INFOTECH AEROSPACE 2007 CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT : [7 - 10 MAY 2007, ROHNERT PARK, CALIFORNIA ; PAPERS], AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS, (20070510), doi:10.2514/6.2007-2707, ISBN 1-56347-881-1, pages 1 - 5, XP009167953 [Y] 1,8,9 * page 2 - page 5; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2514/6.2007-2707 | [Y] - BRIAN VALIMONT R ET AL, "Look where i'm going and go where i'm looking: Camera-up map for unmanned aerial vehicles", HUMAN-ROBOT INTERACTION (HRI), 2011 6TH ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110308), ISBN 978-1-4673-4393-0, pages 275 - 276, XP032225051 [Y] 1,8,9 * page 275, column R - page 276, column L; figures 1,2 * | [Y] - DRAPER MARK ET AL, "Evaluation of Synthetic Vision Overlay Concepts forUAV Sensor Operations: Landmark Cues and Picture-in-Picture", vol. ADA444719, (20060228), pages 1 - 6, DTIC-TR: DEFENSE TECHNICAL INFORMATION CENTER. TECHNICAL REPORT, X, XX, URL: www.dtic.mil/dtic/tr/fulltext/u2/a444719.pdf, (20130312), XP009168012 [Y] 3,5 * pages 2,4 * | [Y] - JOSEPH L COOPER AND MICHAEL A GOODRICH, "Integrating critical interface elements for intuitivesingle-display aviation control of UAVs", ENHANCED AND SYNTHETIC VISION 2006 : 17 - 18 APRIL 2006, KISSIMMEE, FLORIDA, USA, SPIE, (20060417), vol. 6226, doi:10.1117/12.666341, ISBN 978-0-8194-6282-4, page 9p, XP009168011 [Y] 2 * page 7 - page 8; figures 1,3,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.666341 | Examination | US2010084513 |