Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814601

EP2814601 - CATALYTICALLY ACTIVE BODY FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DIMETHYL ETHER FROM SYNTHESIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2016/27]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAEFER, Alexander
Maxburgstrasse 20
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
02 / VON FEHREN, Thorsten
Guntherstrasse 16
68642 Buerstadt / DE
03 / MADON, Rostam
17 Hendrick Road
Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2016/27]
Former [2014/52]Jacobi, Markus Alexander
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date13704769.214.02.2013
[2016/27]
WO2013EP52947
Priority number, dateUS201261598932P15.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261598932 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120938
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814601
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814601
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/04, B01J23/80, C07C41/01, C07C43/04
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATALYTISCH AKTIVER KÖRPER ZUR SYNTHESE VON DIMETHYLETHER AUS SYNTHESEGAS[2014/52]
English:CATALYTICALLY ACTIVE BODY FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DIMETHYL ETHER FROM SYNTHESIS GAS[2014/52]
French:CORPS CATALYTIQUEMENT ACTIF POUR LA SYNTHÈSE DE DIMÉTHYLÉTHER À PARTIR DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
08.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2016Fee for grant paid
25.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2015
Opposition(s)07.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.02.2013
AL06.07.2016
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
GB14.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
MT14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL06.07.2016
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
GB14.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
MT14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
GB14.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
MT14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
GB14.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/07]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/45]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT06.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US4423155  (BELL WELDON K [US] ET AL) [X] 1-20 * example -; claim - *;
 [XD]US2008125311  (BAEK YOUNG SOON [KR] ET AL) [XD] 1-20 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2011105306  (CHIEN CHUN-CHING [TW] ET AL) [X] 1-20 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]  - SOFIANOS A C ET AL, "CONVERSION OF SYNTHESIS GAS TO DIMETHYL ETHER OVER BIFUNCTIONAL CATALYTIC SYSTEMS", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19911101), vol. 30, no. 11, doi:10.1021/IE00059A002, ISSN 0888-5885, pages 2372 - 2378, XP000264760 [X] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie00059a002
by applicantUS6608114
 WO2008157682
 WO2009007113
 WO2007005126
 US6191175
 US2008125311
    - Handbook of Heterogeneous Catalysis, WILEY VCH, (2008), vol. 1