Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798227

EP2798227 - VALVE POSITIONER SYSTEM WITH BLEED PREVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]VALVE POSITIONING SYSTEM WITH BLEED PREVENTION
[2018/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STI Srl
Via G. Pascoli 10 A-B
24020 Gorle-Bergamo (BG) / IT
[2016/09]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Tondolo, Flavio
Via G. Puccini 10
24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
For all designated states
Valoti, Roberto
Via Libertà 66E
24068 Seriate (BG) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / TONDOLO, Flavio
Via G. Puccini 10
24040 Stezzano / IT
02 / VALOTI, Roberto
Via dei Caravaggi 15
24040 Levate / IT
 [2018/37]
Former [2016/09]01 / TONDOLO, Flavio
Via G. Puccini 10
24040 Stezzano / IT
02 / VALOTI, Roberto
Via Libertà 66E
24068 Seriate / IT
Former [2014/45]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Bruni, Giovanni , et al
Laforgia, Bruni & Partners
Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 2
10128 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2018/37]Bruni, Giovanni , et al
Laforgia, Bruni & Partners
Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 78
10129 Torino / IT
Former [2014/45]Pallini Gervasi, Diego , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH
Bavariaring 21
80336 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date13704825.202.01.2013
[2018/37]
WO2013IB00004
Priority number, dateUS201161581833P30.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161581833 P
US20121372847727.12.2012         Original published format: US201213728477
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098800
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798227
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798227
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:F15B20/00, F15B13/042
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VENTILPOSITIONIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT ENTLÜFTUNGSVERHINDERUNG[2014/45]
English:VALVE POSITIONER SYSTEM WITH BLEED PREVENTION[2018/37]
French:SYSTÈME DE POSITIONNEMENT DE VANNE ANTI-FUITE[2018/37]
Former [2014/45]VALVE POSITIONING SYSTEM WITH BLEED PREVENTION
Former [2014/45]SYSTÈME DE POSITIONNEMENT DE VANNE ANTI-SUINTEMENT
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
05.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2018Fee for grant paid
23.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2017
Opposition(s)13.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
LU02.01.2019
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/44]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
LU02.01.2019
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
NO12.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT12.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011284083  (TONDOLO FLAVIO [IT] ET AL) [X] 1,17-20 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-5 * [I] 21;
 [A]EP0822344  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 31; figures 1-2 *
 [XI]  - YEAPLE ET AL, FLUID POWER DESIGN HANDBOOK, (19951024), XP002136333 [X] 1,17 * the whole document * [I] 18,19