Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812468

EP2812468 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING NANOSTRUCTURES ON A SURFACE, ON A MOULD AND ON AN OPTICAL ELEMENT, AND AN OPTICAL ELEMENT AS SUCH MANUFACTURED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PATRICK, Chin
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/19]
Former [2014/51]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13704835.107.02.2013
[2016/19]
WO2013NL50070
Priority number, dateEP2012015451708.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12154517
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119116
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812468
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812468
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C25D11/12, C25D11/24, C25D11/26, C25D11/04, G02B1/11, C25D1/10, C25D1/00
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NANOSTRUKTUREN AUF EINER OBERFLÄCHE, AUF EINER FORM ODER AUF EINEM OPTISCHEN ELEMENT UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT, DAS SO HERGESTELLT WURDE[2015/41]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING NANOSTRUCTURES ON A SURFACE, ON A MOULD AND ON AN OPTICAL ELEMENT, AND AN OPTICAL ELEMENT AS SUCH MANUFACTURED[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE NANOSTRUCTURES SUR UNE SURFACE, SUR UN MOULE ET SUR UN ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE, ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE AINSI FABRIQUÉ[2014/51]
Former [2014/51]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NANOSTRUKTUREN AUF EINER OBERFLÄCHE, AUF EINER FORM ODER AUF EINEM OPTISCHEN ELEMENT UND SO HERGESTELLTES OPTISCHES ELEMENT
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
20.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2016Fee for grant paid
22.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2015
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.02.2013
AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB07.02.2017
IE07.02.2017
LU07.02.2017
MT07.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB07.02.2017
IE07.02.2017
LU07.02.2017
MT07.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB07.02.2017
IE07.02.2017
LU07.02.2017
MT07.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB07.02.2017
IE07.02.2017
LU07.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
LU07.02.2017
Former [2017/48]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP1643546  (CANON KK [JP]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - KUAN-LIANG LAI ET AL, "Fabrication of ordered nanoporous anodic alumina prepatterned by mold-assisted chemical etching", NANOSCALE RESEARCH LETTERS, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1556-276X-6-157, ISSN 1556-276X, page 157, XP055030348 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1556-276X-6-157
 [A]  - SANTOS A ET AL, "In situ electrochemical dissolution of the oxide barrier layer of porous anodic alumina fabricated by hard anodization", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY AND INTERFACIAL ELECTRO CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 632, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JELECHEM.2009.04.008, ISSN 0022-0728, (20090701), pages 139 - 142, (20090417), XP026146355 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelechem.2009.04.008
 [A]  - YUNG-CHIANG TING, "Pore size control of alumina membrane mask", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20060101), vol. 6283, doi:10.1117/12.681837, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 62833I - 62833I-9, XP055030279 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.681837
 [A]  - SHOSO SHINGUBARA, "Fabrication of Nanomaterials Using Porous Alumina Templates", JOURNAL OF NANOPARTICLE RESEARCH, (20030401), vol. 5, no. 1/2, doi:10.1023/A:1024479827507, ISSN 1388-0764, pages 17 - 30, XP055030429 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1024479827507
 [A]  - LANYING YANG ET AL, "Hybrid Moth-Eye Structures for Enhanced Broadband Antireflection Characteristics", APPLIED PHYSICS EXPRESS, (20101001), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.1143/APEX.3.102602, ISSN 1882-0778, page 102602, XP055030434 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/APEX.3.102602
by applicantEP1643546