blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2812468 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2812468



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 166
17.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.11.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
20.11.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.03.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 10
19.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
26.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
22.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3