blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2812468 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP12154517 EP13704835



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015009571Global Dossier 08.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP12154517 08.02.2012
WO2013NL50070 07.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2812468Global Dossier 11.05.2016B1
EP2812468 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13704835 07.02.2013
EP12154517 08.02.2012
WO2013NL50070 07.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013119116Global Dossier 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12154517 08.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2626450Global Dossier 14.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12154517 08.02.2012