Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802581

EP2802581 - 7,8- DIHYDROPYRIDO [3, 4 - B]PYRAZINES AS IP RECEPTOR AGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PULMONARY ARTERIAL HYPERTENSION (PAH) AND RELATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2016  [2016/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / LEBLANC, Catherine
Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited
Wimblehurst Road
Horsham Sussex RH12 5AB / GB
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)von Sprecher, Georg , et al
Novartis Pharma AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Hodge, Emma Jane
Novartis Pharmaceuticals AG
Patent Department
Posfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date13705579.411.01.2013
WO2013IB50273
Priority number, dateUS201261586552P13.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261586552 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105058
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802581
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/4985, A61P9/00, A61P11/00
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:7,8-DIHYDROPYRIDO-[3,4, B-]PYRAZINE ALS IP-REZEPTORAGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PULMONALER ARTERIELLER HYPERTONIE (PAH) UND ZUGEHÖRIGEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2014/47]
English:7,8- DIHYDROPYRIDO [3, 4 - B]PYRAZINES AS IP RECEPTOR AGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PULMONARY ARTERIAL HYPERTENSION (PAH) AND RELATED DISORDERS[2014/47]
French:7,8-DIHYDROPYRIDO[3,4-B]PYRAZINES UTILISÉES COMME AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR IP POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTENSION ARTÉRIELLE PULMONAIRE (HTAP) ET DES TROUBLES ASSOCIÉS[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/16]
30.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007017096  (ALMIRALL PRODESFARMA SA [ES]; VIDAL JUAN BERNAT [ES]; ESTEVE TRIAS CRI) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010008864  (AMIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; HUTCHINSON JOHN HOWARD [US]; STEARNS B) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010280041  (CHEN ING-JUN [TW]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004078163
 EP0039051
 WO0006568
 WO0006569
 WO0242301
 WO03095451
 WO0119355
 WO0119776
 WO0119778
 WO0119780
 WO02070462
 WO02070510
 US6166037
 WO0066558
 WO0066559
 WO2004018425
 WO2004026873
 WO0075114
 WO2005123684
 US2004167167
 WO2004074246
 WO2004074812
 JP2004107299
 WO03099807
 WO2004026841
    - TUDER ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT CARE. MED., (1999), vol. 159, pages 1925 - 1932
    - HUMBERT ET AL., J. AM. COLL. CARDIOL., (2004), vol. 43, pages 13S - 24S
    - ROSENZWEIG, EXPERT OPIN. EMERGING DRUGS, (2006), vol. 11, pages 609 - 619
    - MCLAUGHLIN ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 114, pages 1417 - 1431
    - ROSENKRANZ, CLIN. RES. CARDIOL., (2007), vol. 96, pages 527 - 541
    - DRISCOLL ET AL., EXPERT OPIN. PHARMACOTHER., (2008), vol. 9, pages 65 - 81
    - LOVGREN AK ET AL., AM J PHYSIOF LUNG CELL MOL PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 291, pages L144 - 56
    - ZHU ET AL., RESPIR RES., (2010), vol. 11, no. 1, page 34
    - GAYRAUD M, JOINT BONE SPINE, (2007), vol. 74, no. 1, pages E1 - 8
    - HIRATA Y ET AL., BIOMED PHARMACOTHER., (2009), vol. 63, no. 10, pages 781 - 6
    - KANESHIGE T ET AL., J VET MED SCI., (2007), vol. 69, no. 12, pages 1271 - 6
    - SAHSIVAR MO ET AL., SHOCK, (2009), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 498 - 502
    - SATO N ET AL., DIABETES, (2010), vol. 59, no. 4, pages 1092 - 100
    - SHOUVAL DS ET AL., CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2008), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 105 - 7
    - SPARGIAS K ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2009), vol. 120, no. 18, pages 1793 - 9
    - STRATTON R ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (2001), vol. 108, no. 2, pages 241 - 50
    - TAKENAKA M ET AL., PROSTAGLANDINS LEUKOT ESSENT FATTY ACIDS, (2009), vol. 80, no. 5-6, pages 263 - 7
    - WATANABE M ET AL., AM J NEPHROL., (2009), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 1 - 11
    - YANO T ET AL., AM J PATHOL., (2005), vol. 166, no. 5, pages 1333 - 42
    - ZARDI EM ET AL., EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER., (2007), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 785 - 90
    - ZARDI EM ET AL., IN VIVO, (2006), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 377 - 80
    - REHBERGER P ET AL., ACTA DERM VENEREOL., (2009), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 245 - 9
    - BUNDGAARD, J. MED. CHEM., (1989), page 2503
    - SIMONNEAU ET AL., J. AM. COLL. CARDIOL., (2004), vol. 43, pages 5S - 12S
    - MCGOON ET AL., CHEST, (2004), vol. 126, pages 14S - 34S
    - RABINOVITCH, ANNU. REV. PATHOL. MECH. DIS., (2007), vol. 2, pages 369 - 399
    - STRAUSS ET AL., CLIN. CHEST. MED., (2007), vol. 28, pages 127 - 142
    - TAICHMAN ET AL., CLIN. CHEST. MED., (2007), vol. 28, pages 1 - 22
    - BADESCH ET AL., ANN. INTERN. MED., (2000), vol. 132, pages 425 - 434
    - HUMBERT ET AL., EUR. RESPIR. J., (1999), vol. 13, pages 1351 - 1356
    - MIWA ET AL., INT. HEART J., (2007), vol. 48, pages 417 - 422
    - ROBBINS ET AL., CHEST, (2000), vol. 117, pages 14 - 18
    - AGUILAR ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2000), vol. 162, pages 1846 - 1850
    - ROSENZWEIG ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1999), vol. 99, pages 1858 - 1865
    - ARCHER ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (1998), vol. 158, pages 1061 - 1067
    - MCGOON ET AL., CHEST, (2004), vol. 126, pages 14 - 34
    - HOEPER ET AL., ANN. INTERN. MED., (1999), vol. 130, pages 506 - 509
    - HOEPER ET AL., EUR. RESPIR. J., (2005), vol. 25, pages 502 - 508
    - MONCADA ET AL., LANCET, (1977), vol. 1, pages 18 - 20
    - MURATA ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 388, pages 678 - 682
    - FETALVERO ET AL., PROSTAGLANDINS OTHER LIPID MEDIAT., (2007), vol. 82, pages 109 - 118
    - AREHART ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 14, pages 2161 - 2169
    - DAVI ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2007), vol. 357, pages 2482 - 2494
    - FETALVERO ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. HEART. CIRC. PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 290, pages H1337 - H1346
    - WANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 14507 - 14512
    - XIAO ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, pages 2210 - 2215
    - MCCORMICK ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2007), vol. 35, pages 910 - 911
    - CHAN, J. NUTR., (1998), vol. 128, pages 1593 - 1596
    - MARDLA ET AL., PLATELETS, (2004), vol. 15, pages 319 - 324
    - BERNABEI ET AL., ANN. THORAC. SURG., (1995), vol. 59, pages 149 - 153
    - GAINZA ET AL., J. NEPHROL., (2006), vol. 19, pages 648 - 655
    - STITHAM ET AL., PROSTAGLANDINS OTHER LIPID MEDIAT., (2007), vol. 82, pages 95 - 108
    - FRIES ET AL., HEMATOLOGY AM. SOC. HEMATOL. EDUC. PROGRAM, (2005), pages 445 - 451
    - EGAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 306, pages 1954 - 1957
    - KOBAYASHI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST, (2004), vol. 114, pages 784 - 794
    - TAKAHASHI ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 137, pages 315 - 322
    - IDZKO ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2007), vol. 117, pages 464 - 72
    - NAGAO ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 29, pages 314 - 320
    - IDZKO ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2007), vol. 117, pages 464 - 472
    - ZHOU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 178, pages 702 - 710
    - JAFFAR ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 179, pages 6193 - 6203
    - JOZEFOWSKI ET AL., INT. IMMUNOPHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 3, pages 865 - 878
    - VAN RIJT ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2005), vol. 201, pages 981 - 991
    - RAYCHAUDHURI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 33344 - 33348
    - AYER, L. M.; S. M. WILSON; S. L. TRAVES; D. PROUD; M. A. GIEMBYCZ, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2008), vol. 324, pages 815 - 826
    - CHEN, Y.; M. HANAOKA; P. CHEN; Y. DROMA; N. F. VOELKEL; K. KUBO, AM. J. PHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 296, pages L648 - L656
    - CAMERON ET AL., NAUNYN SCHMIEDEBERGS ARCH. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 367, pages 607 - 614
    - CAMERON, DIABETOLOGIA, (2001), vol. 44, pages 1973 - 1988
    - COTTER ET AL., NAUNYN SCHMIEDEBERGS ARCH. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 347, pages 534 - 540
    - HOTTA ET AL., DIABETES, (1996), vol. 45, pages 361 - 366
    - UENO ET AL., JPN. J. PHARMACOL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 177 - 182
    - UENO ET AL., LIFE SCI., (1996), vol. 59, pages PL1O5 - PL110
    - HOTTA ET AL., PROSTAGLANDINS, (1995), vol. 49, pages 339 - 349
    - SHINDO ET AL., PROSTAGLANDINS, (1991), vol. 41, pages 85 - 96
    - OKUDA ET AL., PROSTAGLANDINS, (1996), vol. 52, pages 375 - 384
    - KOIKE ET AL., FASEB J., (2003), vol. 17, pages 779 - 781
    - OWADA ET AL., NEPHRON, (2002), vol. 92, pages 788 - 796
    - YAMASHITA ET AL., DIABETES RES. CLIN. PRACT., (2002), vol. 57, pages 149 - 161
    - YAMAGISHI ET AL., MOL. MED., (2002), vol. 8, pages 546 - 550
    - BURNETTE ET AL., EXP. EYE RES., (2006), vol. 83, pages 1359 - 1365
    - FUJIWARA ET AL., EXP. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. DIABETES, (2004), vol. 112, pages 390 - 394
    - HOYNG ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1987), vol. 28, pages 470 - 476
    - STRAUSS ET AL., CLIN CHEST MED, (2007), vol. 28, pages 127 - 142
    - YAMADA ET AL., PEPTIDES, (2008), vol. 29, pages 412 - 418
    - DOGAN ET AL., GEN. PHARMACOL., (1996), vol. 27, pages 1163 - 1166
    - FANG, J. CEREB. BLOOD FLOW METAB., (2006), vol. 26, pages 491 - 501
    - JOZEFOWSKI ET AL., INT. IMMUNOPHARMACOL., (2003), pages 865 - 878
    - CZESLICK ET AL., EUR. J. CLIN. INVEST., (2003), vol. 33, pages 1013 - 1017
    - DI RENZO ET AL., PROSTAGLANDIN LEUKOT. ESSENT. FATTY ACIDS, (2005), vol. 73, pages 405 - 410
    - SHINOMIYA ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 61, pages 1153 - 1160
    - KOBAYASHI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2004), vol. 114, pages 784 - 794
    - NAGAO ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL. MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 29, pages 314 - 320
    - GOYA ET AL., METABOLISM, (2003), vol. 52, pages 192 - 198
    - CHENG ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 539 - 541
    - GAO ET AL., RHEUMATOL. INT., (2002), vol. 22, pages 45 - 51
    - BOEHME ET AL., RHEUMATOL. INT., (2006), vol. 26, pages 340 - 347
    - ZHU Y ET AL., RESPIR RES., (2010), vol. 11, no. 1, page 34
    - M. VAYSSAIRAT, J RHEUMATOL, (1999), vol. 26, pages 2173 - 2178
    - TORLAY ET AL., ANN RHEUM DIS, (1991), vol. 50, pages 800 - 804
    - ZARDI ET AL., IN VIVO, (2006), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 377 - 80
    - SATO ET AL., DIABETES, (2010), vol. 59, no. 4, pages 1092 - 100
    - JOHANNES T ET AL., CRIT CARE MED., (2009), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 1423 - 32
    - SPARGIAS K ET AL., CIRCULATION, (20081203), vol. 120, no. 18, pages 1793 - 9
    - MILLS JL ET AL., JAMA, (1999), vol. 282, pages 356 - 362
    - WALSH SW, PROSTAGLANDINS LEUKOT ESSENT FATTY ACIDS, (2004), vol. 70, pages 223 - 232
    - ZLATNIK MG ET AL., AM J OBSTET GYNECOL., (1999), vol. 180, no. 5, pages 1191 - 5