Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2802581 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2802581



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 361
14.03.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.11.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
23.07.2015 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 77
12.06.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 73
19.05.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
18.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
18.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
23.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
23.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 80
18.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 76
29.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2